EP2150264 - STABILIZATION OF LIQUID SOLUTIONS OF RECOMBINANT PROTEIN FOR FROZEN STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare, LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, New Jersey 07981-0915 / US | [2014/08] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC 800 Dwight Way, P.O.box 1986 Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSVETKOVA, Nelly 2955 Carlingford Lane Vallejo, CA 94591 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Omkar 1315 Martin Luther King Jr Way Apt.5 Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | 03 /
WU, Paul 79 Bates Blvd. Orinda, CA / US | 04 /
WANG, Deqian 4400 Water Oak Court Concord, CA 94521 / US | 05 /
DESPONDS, Arnaud 20 rue Du Milieu CH-1400 Yverdon-les-bains / CH | [2010/09] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
TSVETKOVA, Nelly 2955 Carlingford Lane Vallejo, CA 94591 / US | ||
02 /
JOSHI, Omkar 555 Pierce St Apt 1232 Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
03 /
WU, Paul 79 Bates Blvd. Orinda, CA / US | |||
04 /
WANG, Deqian 4400 Water Oak Court Concord, CA 94521 / US | |||
05 /
DESPONDS, Arnaud 20 rue Du Milieu CH-1400 Yverdon-les-bains / CH | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/06] | Burkert, Frank Bayer HealthCare AG LP-PL, Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08746549.8 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008US61147 | Priority number, date | US20070926698P | 26.04.2007 Original published format: US 926698 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134310 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150264 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/02, A61K38/37 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/37 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (KR);
A61K9/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | A61K38/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/06] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNG FLÜSSIGER LÖSUNGEN EINES REKOMBINANTEN PROTEINS FÜR GEFRORENE LAGERUNG | [2010/06] | English: | STABILIZATION OF LIQUID SOLUTIONS OF RECOMBINANT PROTEIN FOR FROZEN STORAGE | [2010/06] | French: | STABILISATION DE SOLUTIONS LIQUIDES DE PROTÉINE RECOMBINANTE POUR UN STOCKAGE À L'ÉTAT CONGELÉ | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 12.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9711957 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-20 * example 8 *; | [Y]US6818439 (JOLLY DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * example 9 ** figure 15 * | International search | [Y]US5278289 (JOHNSON ALAN J [US], et al); | [X]US2004116345 (BESMAN MARC [US], et al); | [A]US2004248778 (GLOGER OLIVER [DE], et al); | [A]US2004248793 (JENSEN MICHAEL BECH [DK], et al) | by applicant | US5576194 | US5733873 | US5804420 | US2004116345 | - SUCK ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 121, pages 361 - 367 |