EP2160231 - IMPROVED HONEYCOMB FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAWISZA, Jeffery, D. 2562 Pine Oak Court Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08747438.3 | 02.05.2008 | [2010/10] | WO2008US62337 | Priority number, date | US20070927653P | 04.05.2007 Original published format: US 927653 P | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008137626 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2160231 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
B01D46/2451 (EP,US);
B01D46/24 (KR);
B01D39/00 (KR);
B01D46/2455 (EP,US);
B01D46/2486 (US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (KR);
F01N3/022 (KR);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
B01D2279/30 (EP,US);
F01N2330/30 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S55/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER WABENFILTER | [2010/10] | English: | IMPROVED HONEYCOMB FILTERS | [2010/10] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS DE FILTRE EN NID D'ABEILLES AMÉLIORÉS | [2010/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 03.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0042301 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * page 6; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4902314 (MIZUKAMI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 3; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1422390 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0023]; figures 5,7; claims 1,6,7 *; | [X]US2005247038 (TAKAHASHI TOMOHISA [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0080]; figures 5-7 *; | [X]EP1604719 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0036]; figure 5 *; | [X]WO2006093231 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [PX]US2007128405 (SAKAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1* paragraphs [0161] , [0162]; figure 2; claims 1,5 *; | EP1854773 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * |