EP2150613 - MUTANT REOVIRUSES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncolytics Biotech, Inc. Suite 210, 1167 Kensington Crescent N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 1X7 / CA | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COFFEY, Matthew C. 2231 Bowness Road, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 3L4 / CA | 02 /
THOMPSON, Bradley G. 1775 - 7th Avenue, N.W. Calgary, Ontario T2N 0Z5 / CA | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2016/42] |
Former [2010/06] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08748334.3 | 21.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008CA00964 | Priority number, date | US20070939255P | 21.05.2007 Original published format: US 939255 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141448 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150613 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2150613 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/01, A61K35/76, A61P35/00, C07K14/14, C12N15/86, C12N15/46 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K2035/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MUTANTE REOVIREN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2010/06] | English: | MUTANT REOVIRUSES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING | [2010/06] | French: | RÉOVIRUS MUTANTS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2008 | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | IE | 21.05.2017 | LU | 21.05.2017 | MT | 21.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.05.2008 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.05.2008 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
MT | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2005111200 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al); | [Y]US7163678 (NORMAN KARA L [US], et al); | [XP]WO2007099401 (UNIV TECHNOLOGIES INT [CA], et al); | [X] - EBERT D.H. ET AL., "Adaptation of reovirus to growth in the presence of protease inhibitor E64 segregates with a mutation in the carboxy terminus of viral outer-capsid protein sigma3", J. VIROLOGY, (200104), vol. 75, no. 7, pages 3197 - 3206, XP002477299 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.7.3197-3206.2001 | [X] - CLARK K. ET AL., "Reovirus variants selected for resistance to ammonium chloride have mutations in viral outer-capsid protein sigma3", J. VIROLOGY, (200601), vol. 80, no. 2, pages 671 - 681, XP008117574 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.80.2.671-681.2006 | [X] - WETZEL J.D. ET AL., "Reovirus variants selected during persistent infections of L cells contain mutations in the viral S1 and S4 genes and are altered in viral disassembly", J. VIROLOGY, (199702), vol. 71, no. 2, pages 1362 - 1369, XP008117575 | by applicant | - GOLDEN ET AL., J. VIRAL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 7430 - 43 | - CHANDRAN; NIBERT, J. VIRAL, (1998), vol. 72, pages 467 - 75 |