EP2154147 - A TRUNCATED L1 PROTEIN OF HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Wantai Biological Pharmacy Enterprise Co., Ltd. No. 31 Kexueyuan Road Changping District Beijing 102206 / CN | For all designated states Xiamen University No. 422 Si Ming Nan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GU, Ying No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | 02 /
LI, Shaowei No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | 03 /
WEI, Minxi No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | 04 /
XIAN, Yangling No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | 05 /
LUO, Wenxin No.422 Si Ming Nan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | 06 /
XIA, Ningshao No.422 Si Ming Nan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | [2015/41] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
GU, Ying No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | ||
02 /
LI, Shaowei No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | |||
03 /
WEI, Minxi No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | |||
04 /
XIAN, Yangling No. 422 Simingnan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | |||
05 /
LUO, Wenxin No.422 Si Ming Nan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | |||
06 /
XIA, Ningshao No.422 Si Ming Nan Road Siming District Xiamen, Fujian 361005 / CN | Representative(s) | van Heuvel, Margaretha, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2015/41] |
Former [2010/07] | van Heuvel, Margaretha, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 08748431.7 | 29.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008CN00872 | Priority number, date | CN2007197762 | 29.04.2007 Original published format: CN200710097762 | CN2008108761 | 23.01.2008 Original published format: CN200810008761 | [2010/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134934 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154147 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154147 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/02, C07K14/025, A61K39/12 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
C12N2710/20022 (EP,US);
C12N2710/20034 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | C07K14/025, C12N15/37, C12N7/02, C07K1/18, A61K39/12, A61P31/20, A61P15/02, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 24.11.2009 | BA | 24.11.2009 | MK | 24.11.2009 | RS | 24.11.2009 | Title | German: | GEKÜRZTES L1-PROTEIN DES HUMANEN PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 | [2010/07] | English: | A TRUNCATED L1 PROTEIN OF HUMAN PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 | [2010/07] | French: | PROTÉINE L1 TRONQUÉE DU PAPILLOMAVIRUS 16 HUMAIN | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2009 | Translation filed | 24.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 01.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2013 | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2008 | AT | 07.10.2015 | BE | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | IE | 29.04.2016 | LU | 29.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 29.04.2008 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.04.2016 | ||
LU | 29.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.04.2008 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.04.2016 | ||
LU | 29.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.04.2008 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.04.2016 | ||
LU | 29.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
IE | 29.04.2016 | ||
LU | 29.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 29.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - CHEN X S ET AL, "Papillomavirus capsid protein expression in Escherichia coli: purification and assembly of HPV11 and HPV16 L1", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20010316), vol. 307, no. 1, doi:10.1006/JMBI.2000.4464, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 173 - 182, XP004469210 [X] 1-7,9 * page 173 - page 181; figure 4; table 1 * [I] 10-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.4464 | International search | [X]WO0054730 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al); | [Y]WO03078455 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al); | [XP]US6649167 (HALLEK MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [X]CN1478790 (MA RUNLIN [CN]); | [X]CN1821410 (ZENG YI [CN]); | [X]CN101153280 (XIAMEN UNIVERSITY BEIJING WANT [CN]); | [X] - CHEN X.S. ET AL., "Structure of small virus-like particles assembled from the L1 protein of human papillomavirus 16", MOLECULAR CELL, (200003), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 557 - 567, XP002216859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)80449-9 | [A] - SUN X. ET AL., "Purification of human papillomavirus type 16 major capsid protein L1", JOURNAL OF CHENDE MEDICAL COLLEGE, (20020601), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 85 - 87 | Examination | WO9420137 | US2002193565 | WO2004056389 | - DE VILLIERS E-M ET AL, "Classification of papillomaviruses", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040620), vol. 324, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2004.03.033, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 17 - 27, XP004512668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2004.03.033 | - JANA S ET AL, "Strategies for efficient production of heterologous proteins in Escherichia coli", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050501), vol. 67, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00253-004-1814-0, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 289 - 298, XP019331816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-004-1814-0 | - LUO W X ET AL, "[Construction and application of an Escherichia coli high effective expression vector with an enhancer].", SHENG WU GONG CHENG XUE BAO = CHINESE JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY SEP 2000, (200009), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 1000-3061, pages 578 - 581, XP008166031 | - NING-XIA FANG ET AL, "Post translational modifications of recombinant human Papillomavirus type 6b major capsid protein", VIRUS RESEARCH, (19990401), vol. 60, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0168-1702(98)00117-8, ISSN 0168-1702, pages 113 - 121, XP055090344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1702(98)00117-8 | by applicant | - CLIFFORD, G.; S. FRANCESCHI ET AL., VACCINE, (2006), vol. 24, no. 3, pages S26 - 34 | - BOYLE, P.; J. FERLAY, ANN ONCOL, (2005), vol. 16, pages 481 - 8 | - KIRNBAUER, R.; F. BOOY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1992), vol. 89, no. 24, pages 12180 - 4 | - BANKS, L.; G MATLASHEWSKI ET AL., J GEN VIROL, (1987), vol. 68, no. 12, pages 3081 - 9 | - KELSALL, S. R.; J. K. KULSKI, J VIROL METHODS, (1995), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 75 - 90 | - LI, M.; T. P. CRIPE ET AL., J VIROL, (1997), vol. 71, no. 4, pages 2988 - 95 | - LUO XINWEN ET AL., CHINESE JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 16, pages 53 - 57 | - YEAGER, M. D; ASTE-AMEZAGA, M. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2000), pages 570 - 7 | - The Molecular Cloning Experiment Guide |