Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2165563 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2013 | B1 | EP2165563 | 24.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008DK00199 | 29.05.2008 | DKPA200700785 | 31.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008145127 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200700785 | 31.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK176704B | 23.03.2009 | B1 | DK200700785 | 01.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200700785 | 31.05.2007 |