EP2152548 - DEVICE FOR SUSPENDING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinetix AG Hauptstrasse 49 8750 Glarus / CH | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKERET, Peter Badenerstrasse 734 CH-8048 Zürich / CH | [2010/10] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
ACKERET, Peter Allmendstrasse 18 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/18] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Sparing, Rolf Klaus, et al Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749182.5 | 27.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008EP03409 | Priority number, date | DE20071020157 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007020157 | DE20071022454 | 10.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022454 | DE20071045171 | 20.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007045171 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008131944 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2152548 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152548 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/04, B60R7/10, B60R11/00 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
B60R7/10 (EP);
B60R7/043 (EP);
B60R2011/0015 (EP);
B60R2011/0017 (EP);
B60R2011/0059 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | B60R7/10, B60R11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFHÄNGEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2010/07] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUSPENDING OBJECTS | [2010/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION D'OBJETS | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | IE | 27.04.2015 | LU | 27.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.04.2015 | ||
LU | 27.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.04.2015 | ||
LU | 27.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
ES | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9325411 (GREEN RUSSELL [GB]) [DA] 1,38-74 * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19612232 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 75-89 * column 2, lines 19-33 * * figure . *; | [A]EP0844138 (MEIER RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1,38-74 * abstract * * figure - *; | [YA]FR2787403 (ZAGHDOUN ASHIR RONI [FR]) [Y] 75-88 * page 3 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 89; | [YA]DE202004008944U (TECHCOM CARCOMMUNIKATION AG [DE]) [Y] 75-88 * paragraph [0028] * * figures 7-11 * [A] 89; | [A]WO2005061275 (VACITY JOZSEF [HU]) [A] 1,38-74 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure - *; | [A]US2006032996 (WU TAI-HSIUNG [TW]) [A] 75-89 * paragraphs [0017] , [0023] ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102005051708 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,38-74 * abstract * * figure - * |