EP2155863 - TWO-STEP TEMPERATURE PROFILE FOR THE PROPAGATION OF VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare S.A. Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REITER, Manfred Gebrüder-Lang-Gasse 11/17 A-1150 Vienna / AT | 02 /
GRILLBERGER, Leopold Postgasse 13/20 A-1010 Vienna / AT | 03 /
MUNDT, Wolfgang Florianigasse 57/1/2/6 A-1080 Vienna / AT | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749279.9 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008EP03532 | Priority number, date | US20070927693P | 04.05.2007 Original published format: US 927693 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008135230 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155863 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155863 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/00, C12N7/02 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
C12N7/04 (KR);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N7/02 (KR);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16151 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16234 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16251 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24151 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGES TEMPERATURPROFIL FÜR DIE PROPAGIERUNG VON VIREN | [2010/08] | English: | TWO-STEP TEMPERATURE PROFILE FOR THE PROPAGATION OF VIRUSES | [2010/08] | French: | PROFIL DE TEMPÉRATURES EN DEUX ÉTAPES POUR LA PROPAGATION DE VIRUS | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | CY | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | IE | 30.04.2015 | LU | 30.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
IE | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03085138 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP1526172 (CHIRON BEHRING GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] * examples 1-6 *; | [X] - WECHUCK JAMES B ET AL, "Effect of temperature, medium composition, and cell passage on production of herpes-based viral vectors", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20020705), vol. 79, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 112 - 119, XP002491976 [X] 1,7-12,14-19,24 * page 116, column L, line 8 - column R, line L; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10310 | [A] - ROTT R ET AL, "BIOCHEMICAL STUDIES ON INFLUENZA VIRUS MULTIPLICATION AT REDUCED TEMPERATURES FOWL PLAGUE VIRUS CHICK EMBRYO FIBROBLASTS", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (1968), vol. 3, no. PART 2, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 239 - 524, XP002491977 [A] 2-4 * page 243, paragraph 4; figure 3 * * page 245, paragraphs 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/0022-1317-3-2-239 | [A] - INN H YUK ET AL, "A serum-free Vero production platform for a chimeric virus vaccine candidate", CYTOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20061116), vol. 51, no. 3, ISSN 1573-0778, pages 183 - 192, XP019448504 [A] * page 188, column L, paragraphs 2,3; figure 2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10616-006-9030-7 | [A] - JARDON M ET AL, "pH, pCO2, and temperature effect on R-adenovirus production", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, XX, XX, (20030201), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 202 - 208, XP002296609 [A] * page 204, column R, paragraph L - page 207, column L, paragraph 3; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp025585a | [A] - MCTAGGART SALLY ET AL, "Effects of culture parameters on the production of retroviral vectors by a human packaging cell line", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (20000901), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 859 - 865, XP002333787 [A] * page 861, column L, paragraphs 3,4; figure 2 * * page 867, column R, paragraphs 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp000078j |