EP2155659 - SUBSTITUTED PHENYLAMINO-BENZENE DERIVATIVES USEFUL FOR TREATING HYPER-PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS AND DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH MITOGEN EXTRACELLULAR KINASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDOLPH, Joachim 1483 Balboa Avenue Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
DUMAS, Jaques 35 Suffolk Lane Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US | 03 /
LI, Yingfu 48 Tanglewood Drive Hamden, Connecticut 06518 / US | 04 /
AUCLAIR, Daniel 150 Pheasant Drive Middletown, Connecticut 06457 / US | 05 /
LOBELL, Mario Am Eigenbach 16 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
HITCHCOCK, Marion Pfeddersheiiner Weg 51a 14129 Berlin / DE | 07 /
HARTUNG, Ingo Schmiedestrasse 12 40699 Erkrath / DE | 08 /
KOPPITZ, Marcus Scharnhorststr. 28 10115 Berlin / DE | 09 /
BRITTAIN, Dominic Sredzkistr. 57 10405 Berlin / DE | 10 /
PUEHLER, Florian Jules-Verne-Strasse 50 14089 Berlin / DE | 11 /
PETERSEN, Kirstin Kufsteiner Strasse 10 10825 Berlin / DE | 12 /
GUENTHER, Judith Parkstrasse 60 13187 Berlin / DE | 13 /
BADER, Benjamin Hillmannstrasse 14 13467 Berlin / DE | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749469.6 | 09.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008EP03936 | Priority number, date | US20070928789P | 11.05.2007 Original published format: US 928789 P | EP20080075314 | 22.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08075314 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008138639 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155659 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/92, C07C233/65, C07C255/59, C07C271/16, C07C307/10, C07D211/22, C07D317/22, C07D497/04, C07D295/088, A61K31/136, A61K31/4465, A61K31/277, A61K31/167, A61K31/357, A61K31/495 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C07D233/60 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C217/92 (EP,US);
C07C237/30 (EP,US);
C07C237/44 (EP,US);
C07C243/38 (EP,US);
C07C255/58 (EP,US);
C07C255/59 (EP,US);
C07C271/16 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07C271/44 (EP,US);
C07C275/28 (EP,US);
C07C275/36 (EP,US);
C07C307/02 (EP,US);
C07C307/10 (EP,US);
C07C309/66 (EP,US);
C07C311/08 (EP,US);
C07C311/09 (EP,US);
C07C311/17 (EP,US);
C07C311/48 (EP,US);
C07D205/04 (EP,US);
C07D207/08 (EP,US);
C07D207/27 (EP,US);
C07D207/48 (EP,US);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D211/22 (EP,US);
C07D211/46 (EP,US);
C07D211/96 (EP,US);
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D213/34 (EP,US);
C07D213/68 (EP,US);
C07D231/18 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D265/30 (EP,US);
C07D277/22 (EP,US);
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,US);
C07D295/26 (EP,US);
C07D317/22 (EP,US);
C07D317/64 (EP,US);
C07D327/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLAMINBENZEN-DERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG HYPERPROLIFERATIVER UND DURCH EXTRAZELLULÄRE MITROGENKINASE-AKTIVITÄT HERVORGERUFENER ERKRANKUNGEN | [2010/08] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PHENYLAMINO-BENZENE DERIVATIVES USEFUL FOR TREATING HYPER-PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS AND DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH MITOGEN EXTRACELLULAR KINASE ACTIVITY | [2010/08] | French: | DERIVES DE PHENYLAMINO-BENZENE SUBSTITUES UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ET DE TROUBLES HYPERPROLIFERATIFS ASSOCIES AVEC L'ACTIVITE DES KINASES EXTRACELLULAIRES ACTIVEES PAR DES MITOGENES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3867437 (FUJIMURA HAJIME, et al) [X] 1-13,15,24 * 4th,13th,14th,16th,20th,33rd-35th compounds in table 2; column 2, lines 55-60; column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 45;;; examples 3,5,9,21,34; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0360566 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 14, lines 35-45 *; | [A]WO2007014011 (VALEANT RES & DEV [US], et al) [A] 1-25* claims 1,52,53 *; | [X] - IAN HUTCHINSON AND MALCOLM F. G. STEVENS, "Synthetic strategies to a telomere-targeted pentacyclic heteroaromatic salt", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (20061123), vol. 5, pages 114 - 120, XP002491234 [X] 1-10 * Compound 15 on pages 117 and 119 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b613580n |