EP2142376 - TAPE PRINTING APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH DISPLAYING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYMO Industriepark Noord 30 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN POTTELBERGHE, Peter Kemzekestraat 104 B-9111 Belsele / BE | 02 /
DULLAERT, Jimmy Kiekenhaag 75 a B-9190 Stekene / BE | 03 /
VLEURINCK, Jos Stichelendries B-9340 Oordegem / BE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2010/02] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08749524.8 | 07.04.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008EP54180 | Priority number, date | GB20070006788 | 05.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0706788 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008122635 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2142376 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2142376 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
B41J3/46 (EP,US);
G06F40/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDDRUCKER UND VERFAHREN MIT FUNKTIONSANZEIGE | [2010/02] | English: | TAPE PRINTING APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH DISPLAYING FEATURES | [2010/02] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION SUR BANDE | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2008 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | HR | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | NO | 20.02.2014 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | IE | 07.04.2014 | LU | 07.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.04.2008 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 07.04.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 07.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | |
NO | 20.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29602534U (ESSELTE NV [BE]) [X] 1-6,12,17,24,33-39,45,56,65,76,77 * page 18, line 11 - page 19, line 10; figure 4 * * page 13, line 14 - line 22 *; | [X]US5813021 (TOYOSAWA YOSHIYA [JP], et al) [X] 33,65 * column 13, line 28 - column 25, line 64; figures 9,26,28,34,35 * * column 18, line 63 - column 19, line 54 * * column 19, line 49 - line 54 * * column 24, line 48 - column 25, line 64; figures 26,28,33,34 * * column 24, line 48 - column 25, line 64; figures 26,28,33,34 *; | [X]US5873110 (TOYOSAWA YOSHIYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,17,33,34,38,39,76,77 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 47; figure 3 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 42; figures 7,8 *; | [X]EP0600593 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,33,34,65 * column 24, line 57 - column 25, line 56; figures 16,17 * * column 22, line 53 - column 23, line 1 * * column 32, line 12 - line 25 * * figure 17 *; | [X]US2006193669 (TAKADA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,34-37 * paragraphs [0045] , [0098] - [0101]; figure 12 *; | [XA]EP1527890 (DYMO CORP [US]) [X] 1,33,34,65 * paragraphs [0029] , [0042] - [0099] - [0108] - [0122]; figures 1,10-12 * * page 5, line 56 * * page 8, line 39 - page 9, line 3 * * page 10, line 1 - line 7 * * paragraph [0082] * * figures 9c,9d * [A] 31,63,27,59,22,54; | [X]EP1362705 (ESSELTE NV [BE]) [X] 1,33,34,65 * paragraphs [0094] - [0108]; figures 14-17 *; | [XA]US2003110441 (TSUKUDA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,33,34,65 * paragraphs [0046] , [0094] , [0095] , [0125]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0125] * [A] 22,54; | [XA]EP1435579 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,33,34,65 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0075]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0014] * [A] 22,54; | [X]EP0816105 (ESSELTE NV [BE]) [X] 1,33,34,65 * column 11, line 40 - column 24, line 58; figures 4-12 * * column 19, line 56 - column 20, line 18; figures 4-7 * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 1 * * column 14, line 19 - line 27 * * column 17, line 43 - line 51; figure 6 * * figures 4-12 *; | [X]US2005007606 (MIYASAKA NORIAKI [JP]) [X] 33,65 * figures 1,5 *; | [XA]US2005002715 (FRIES TODD [US], et al) [X] 33,65 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0105]; figures 15,16 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098] * [A] 22,54; | [X]EP0783156 (KING JIM CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 22,54 * column 26, line 17 - line 19 * * column 27, line 38 - column 30, line 42; figure 17(b) * * column 33, line 15 - line 21 *; | [A]US2005073720 (KAJIHARA MIKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 22,54 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061]; figures 8,10-12 *; | [A]US2007013950 (KAJIHARA MIKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 22,54 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] *; | [A]EP1120263 (ESSELTE NV [BE]) [A] 22,54,27,59 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0055] * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0650841 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 27,59 * column 7, line 19 - line 29 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 6 *; | [A]JP2004230610 (SATO KK) [A] 27,59 * abstract *; | [X]EP1201444 (ESSELTE NV [BE]) [X] 28-30,60-62 * paragraphs [0037] , [0054]; claims 1,3 *; | [X]WO03053703 (ESSELTE NV [BE], et al) [X] 28-30,60-62 * page 11, line 6 - line 9; figure 11 *; | [A]EP0855282 (ESSELTE NV [BE]) [A] 31,63 * claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0783156 |