EP2150925 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DEVICE COMPRISING A TRANSPONDER ANTENNA AND DEVICE PRODUCED THUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINENT, Jean-François Résidence L'Empyrée Bt B 2, rue Pascal Fieschi F-13090 Aix En Provence / FR | 02 /
ROBLES, Laurence Route Source des Nayes F-83640 Saint Zacharie / FR | 03 /
ALLEYSSON, Blandine 11, rue René Ollier Le Lyautey F-13470 Carnoux / FR | [2010/06] | Application number, filing date | 08750265.4 | 13.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008EP55844 | Priority number, date | EP20070301055 | 21.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07301055 | [2010/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141977 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150925 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/02 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G06K19/02 (EP);
G06K19/027 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
H01Q1/085 (EP);
H01Q1/20 (EP);
H01Q1/2225 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER TRANSPONDERANTENNE UND AUF DIESE WEISE HERGESTELLTE VORRICHTUNG | [2010/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DEVICE COMPRISING A TRANSPONDER ANTENNA AND DEVICE PRODUCED THUS | [2010/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF COMPORTANT UNE ANTENNE DE TRANSPONDEUR ET DISPOSITIF OBTENU | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DAX]JP2002298110 (OJI PAPER CO) [DA] 1 * the whole document * [X] 7; | [X]DE4421607 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 7 * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * column 5, line 13 - line 15 * * column 6, line 4 - line 21 * * column 7, line 9 - line 28 *; | [X]WO0227651 (GISECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]; HOPPE JOACHIM [DE]; HOHMANN ARNO [DE]) [X] 7 * page 12, line 25 - line 29 * |