EP2153087 - TRANSMISSION MODULE AND TRANSMISSION ASSEMBLY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valtra Inc PO Box 557 44201 Suolahti / FI | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIITASALO, Ville Parilankatu 2 FIN-40250 Jyvaskyla / FI | 02 /
RUOKOLA, Timo Vaskontie 25 FIN-40520 Jyväskylä / FI | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08750966.7 | 16.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008IB01227 | Priority number, date | GB20070009636 | 19.05.2007 Original published format: GB 0709636 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008142525 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153087 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153087 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H47/04, F16H37/08, F16H57/02 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP,US);
F16H57/033 (EP,US);
B60K17/28 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/221 (EP,US);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0886 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEMODUL UND GETRIEBEMONTAGEVERFAHREN | [2010/07] | English: | TRANSMISSION MODULE AND TRANSMISSION ASSEMBLY METHOD | [2010/07] | French: | MODULE DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE TRANSMISSION | [2010/16] |
Former [2010/07] | MODULE DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCEDE D'ENSEMBLE DE TRANSMISSION | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 10.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | HR | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | MT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | NO | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | IE | 16.05.2011 | LU | 16.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 16.05.2011 | ||
LU | 16.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 16.05.2011 | ||
LU | 16.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 16.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]BE446502 (PIV) [A] 1,27* the whole document *; | [A]DE2910184 (ARNOLD GERHARD) [A] 1,27 * page 16, line 13 - page 17, line 10 * * page 22, line 14 - page 24, line 14 * * figures 1,7,8 *; | [A]DE19902084 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,27 * figures 3,4,6,7 *; | [DA]US2002042319 (OTTEN ULI [DE], et al) [DA] 1,27 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003130213 (YANMAR AGRICULT EQUIP, et al) [A] 1,27 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10319252 (CLAAS INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,27 * figures 3,5 * |