23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
26.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
17.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.06.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.06.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
25.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.05.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.05.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
01.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.12.2016 |
First examination report |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
16.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.02.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
15.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
15.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
05.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|