EP2158750 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Akihiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Foxon, Rachel Siobhan, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [2010/09] | Application number, filing date | 08752838.6 | 09.05.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008JP58984 | Priority number, date | JP20070131572 | 17.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007131572 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008143148 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2158750 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04M1/247, H04W88/02 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04W92/08 (KR);
H04M1/72436 (EP,US);
H04M1/733 (EP,US);
H04M2250/14 (EP,US);
H04M2250/16 (EP,US);
H04M2250/66 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | H04M1/00, H04M1/247, H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT | [2010/09] | English: | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL | [2010/09] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 02.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0223868 (POLTI SPA [IT], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 14 - page 20, line 17 * * figures 1-6 *; | [XI]DE10138835 (T MOBILE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [I] 2-13,15; | [I]FR2871021 (COUPEAU BORIS [FR]) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 1 - page 11, line 18 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006270441 (MIYATA KATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0038] ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2007015546 (ITO TSURUMI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]JP2002044729 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2002095038 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [A]JP2003143646 (NTT COMWARE CORP); | [A]JP2004228694 (NEC SAITAMA LTD); | [A]WO2004102930 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007006192 (KYOCERA CORP) | Examination | EP1724998 | by applicant | WO0223868 | DE10138835 | JP2003189361 | FR2871021 |