EP2149622 - PRETREATMENT PROCESS FOR ELECTROLESS PLATING OF RESIN MOLDED BODY, METHOD FOR PLATING RESIN MOLDED BODY, AND PRETREATMENT AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 7-10, Dosho-machi 4 chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [2010/15] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Okuno Chemical Industries Co. Ltd 7-10, Doshomachi 4-Chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAO, Toshimitsu c/o Main Research Laboratory of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 10-25 Hanatenhigashi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIKANE, Yusuke c/o Main Research Laboratory of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 10-25 Hanatenhigashi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIKAWA, Junji c/o Main Research Laboratory of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 10-25 Hanatenhigashi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 04 /
MORIMOTO, Toru c/o Main Research Laboratory of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 10-25 Hanatenhigashi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 05 /
MURATA, Toshiya c/o Main Research Laboratory of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 10-25 Hanatenhigashi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 538-0044 / JP | 06 /
SATOU, Kazuya c/o Main Research Laboratory of OKUNO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 10-25 Hanatenhigashi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 538-0044 / JP | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08752904.6 | 16.05.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008JP59075 | Priority number, date | JP20070135200 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007135200 | [2010/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008143190 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149622 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2149622 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/24, C23C18/20, C23C18/30, C25D5/56, C23C18/16, C23C18/22, C23C18/28 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
C23C18/22 (EP,US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,US);
C23C18/2086 (EP,US);
C23C18/24 (EP,US);
C23C18/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/05] | C23C18/24, C23C18/20, C23C18/30, C25D5/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | VORBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR STROMLOSES PLATTIEREN EINES HARZFORMKÖRPERS, VERFAHREN ZUR PLATTIERUNG EINES HARZFORMKÖRPERS UND VORBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL | [2010/05] | English: | PRETREATMENT PROCESS FOR ELECTROLESS PLATING OF RESIN MOLDED BODY, METHOD FOR PLATING RESIN MOLDED BODY, AND PRETREATMENT AGENT | [2010/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉTRAITEMENT POUR LE DÉPÔT AUTOCATALYTIQUE D'UN CORPS MOULÉ DE RÉSINE, PROCÉDÉ DE PLACAGE DE CORPS MOULÉ DE RÉSINE ET AGENT DE PRÉTRAITEMENT | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2008 | Translation filed | 19.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 29.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/20] | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4820548 (COURDUVELIS CONSTANTINE I [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,4 * * column 6, lines 62-65 * * column 7, lines 8-23,30-36 * * examples 1,2 *; | [XI]US5110355 (PENDLETON PHILLIP [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 6, lines 27-60 * * column 8, line 38 - column 9, line 65 * [I] 2; | [X]US5198096 (FOUST DONALD F [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 1; example 4; claims 1,2,9 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 19 * * column 7, lines 23-56 *; | [A]JPS5089476 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 07, Database accession no. 1976-11960X, XP002587352 & JPS5089476 A 19750717 (OKABAYASHI K) [A] 2 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2003193247 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH0310084 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]JPH03223468 (SHIPLEY CO); | [Y]JPH05339738 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]JP2003277941 (OMURA TORYO KK, et al); | [A]JP2007100174 (OKUNO CHEM IND CO); | [A]JPH0238578 (KIZAI KK) | by applicant | US4820548 |