EP2151688 - NON-SPECIFIC ADSORPTION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | [2018/28] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMORI, Kouji c/o JSR CORPORATION 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMOTO, Eiji c/o JSR CORPORATION 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Toshihiro c/o JSR CORPORATION 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | [2018/28] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
TAMORI, Kouji c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10 Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAMOTO, Eiji c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10 Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | |||
03 /
OGAWA, Toshihiro c/o JSR CORPORATION 6-10 Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/28] |
Former [2010/06] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08752921.0 | 19.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008JP59101 | Priority number, date | JP20070143017 | 30.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007143017 | [2010/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008146631 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151688 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151688 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/531, G01N33/543, C08F220/52 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
C08F220/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | G01N33/531, G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INHIBITOR NICHTSPEZIFISCHER ADSORPTION | [2010/06] | English: | NON-SPECIFIC ADSORPTION INHIBITOR | [2010/06] | French: | INHIBITEUR D'ADSORPTION NON SPÉCIFIQUE | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2009 | Translation filed | 03.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2008 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08193103 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 40, Database accession no. 1996-397250, XP002606791 & JPH08193103 A 19960730 (SHOWA HIGH POLYMER CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2004286558 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD); | [A]US2006091015 (LAU ALDRICH N [US]); | [A]JP2006266743 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2006322709 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [A]JP2007510889 ; | [A]JP2007171054 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [A] - TERAMAE A. AND ANAZAWA T., "Shigaisen Koka Jushi o Mochiita Polymerase Rensa Hannoyo Micro Device", REPORT OF KAWAMURA INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, (2001), pages 67 - 74, XP008124702 | by applicant | JPH08193103 | JPH10153599 | JPH11352127 | JP3443891B |