EP2180302 - OPTICAL SIGNAL SAMPLING DEVICE AND ITS METHOD, AND OPTICAL MONITOR DEVICE USING SAME AND ITS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anritsu Corporation 5-1-1, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Anritsu Corporation 5-1-1, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTANI, Akihito c/o Int. Prop. Prom. Dep. ANRITSU CORP., 5-1-1, Onna Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8555 / JP | 02 /
TANIMOTO, Takao c/o Int. Prop. Prom. Dep. ANRITSU CORP., 5-1-1, Onna Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8555 / JP | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2010/17] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 08753044.0 | 21.05.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008JP59367 | Priority number, date | JP20070138934 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007138934 | [2010/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008146684 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180302 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01J11/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
G01J11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABTASTUNG OPTISCHER SIGNALE, VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND OPTISCHES ÜBERWACHUNGSGERÄT DAMIT SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/17] | English: | OPTICAL SIGNAL SAMPLING DEVICE AND ITS METHOD, AND OPTICAL MONITOR DEVICE USING SAME AND ITS METHOD | [2010/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE SIGNAL OPTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ, ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE OPTIQUE UTILISANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF ET SON PROCÉDÉ | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | Translation filed | 10.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2008 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 23.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2004286511 (ANRITSU CORP) [I] 1-23 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] - [0054]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 1,7,22,23; | [Y]US2005047788 (MIYAZAKI TETSUYA [JP]) [Y] 1,7,22,23* paragraphs [0017] , [0023] * | International search | [Y]JPH1172757 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH0663869B ; | [Y]JP2004286511 (ANRITSU CORP); | [Y]JPH08204678 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPS62215917 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [Y]JP2003344168 (ANDO ELECTRIC); | [A]JP2005345312 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH08233662 (ANDO ELECTRIC) | [Y] - EDAGAWA N. ET AL., "Denki Kyushugata Hikari Henchoki o Mochiita Hacho Henkan", 1997 THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS SOGO TAIKAI KOEN RONBUNSHU, (1997), page 727 + ABSTR. NO. B-10-218, XP008101838 | Examination | - HONGMING ZHANG ET AL, "Optical waveform measurement with electroabsorption modulator as sampling component", OPTICAL ENGINEERING., BELLINGHAM, (20040201), vol. 43, no. 2, doi:10.1117/1.1637361, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 441 - 444, XP055222842 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1637361 | by applicant | JP3796357B | JP2004222252 | JP2002368313 | US6819689 |