EP2162141 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ISCHEMIC LIMB DISEASE COMPRISING STEM CELLS DERIVED FROM ADIPOSE TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RNL Bio Co., Ltd. 1596-7 Bongcheon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RA, Jeong Chan 626-701 Cheongsolmaeul SK Hanhwa APT., 918, Jeongja-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-300 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Hae Jung 5201-201 Chodang Maeul Hyunjin Everville Apt. 13-2 Jung-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-718 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hang Young 526-1803 Baekseol Maeul Jinlo Apt. Jeongja-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-719 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hyo Eun 105-601 Lotte Apt. Guro 5-dong Guro-gu Seoul 152-770 / KR | [2013/37] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
RA, Jeong Chan 626-701 Cheongsolmaeul SK Hanhwa APT., 918, Jeongja-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-300 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Hae Jung 5201-201 Chodang Maeul Hyunjin Everville Apt. 13-2 Jung-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-718 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Hang Young 526-1803 Baekseol Maeul Jinlo Apt. Jeongja-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 440-719 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Hyo Eun 105-601 Lotte Apt. Guro 5-dong Guro-gu Seoul 152-770 / KR | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08753410.3 | 09.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008KR02614 | Priority number, date | KR20070050624 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: KR 20070050624 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008147057 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2162141 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162141 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A01N63/00, A61K45/06, A61P25/02, A61K9/10, A61K38/38, A61K9/08, A61K31/10, A61K31/198, A61K47/02, A61K47/18, A61K47/20, A61K47/26, A61K47/42, A61K9/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/38 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/10, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/38, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/11] | A61K35/34, A01N63/00, C12N5/06, A61K45/00, A61P25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ISCHÄMISCHER ERKRANKUNG DER EXTREMITÄTEN MIT STAMMZELLEN AUS FETTGEWEBE | [2010/11] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ISCHEMIC LIMB DISEASE COMPRISING STEM CELLS DERIVED FROM ADIPOSE TISSUE | [2010/11] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE ISCHÉMIQUE DES MEMBRES COMPRENANT DES CELLULES SOUCHES DÉRIVÉES DE TISSU ADIPEUX | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 21.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2008 | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | NL | 11.09.2013 | PL | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | TR | 11.09.2013 | NO | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | IE | 09.05.2014 | LU | 09.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.05.2008 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 09.05.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 09.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
PL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
NL | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006134951 (BIOMASTER INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * Description;; example 4; claim - * [Y] 1-6; | [XY]WO2006136244 (CELLERIX SL [ES], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0052] , [0 89]; example 2; claim - * [Y] 1-6; | [Y] - THIRUMALA S ET AL, "Transport phenomena during freezing of adipose tissue derived adult stem cells", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 20051105 JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. US, (20051105), vol. 92, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1002/BIT.20615, pages 372 - 383, XP009142402 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20615 | International search | [X]WO03059272 (FORD HENRY HEALTH SYSTEM [US], et al); | [X]WO2005034843 (MACROPORE BIOSURGERY INC [US], et al); | [X] - REHMAN J. ET AL., "Angiogenic potential of subcutaneous adipose stromal cells for autologous cell therapy", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, (20030319), vol. 41, no. 6, SUPPL. A, page 308A, XP009028844 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0735-1097(03)82443-9 | [X] - PLANAT-BENARD V. ET AL., "Plasticity of Human Adipose Lineage Cells Toward Endothelial Cells: Physiological and Therapeutic Perspectives", CIRCULATION, (20040210), vol. 109, no. 5, pages 656 - 663, XP009034616 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000114522.38265.61 | [X] - MIRANVILLE A. ET AL., "Human adipose tissue-derived stem cells improve blood flow in the ischemic mouse hind-limb", CIRCULATION, (20031028), vol. 108, no. 17, SUPPL., page IV-164, XP008048883 | [A] - STASHOWER M. ET AL., "Stromal progenitor cells present within liposuction and reduction abdominoplasty fat for autologous transfer to aged skin", DERMATOLOGIC SURGERY, (1999), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 945 - 949, XP002233641 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1524-4725.1999.99098.x | [A] - RANGAPPA S. ET AL., "Transformation of adult mesenchymal stem cells isolated from the fatty tissue into cardiomyocytes", ANNALS OF THORACIC SURGERY, (200303), vol. 75, no. 3, pages 775 - 779, XP002401034 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-4975(02)04568-X | by applicant | US6777231 | WO2006134951 | WO2006136244 | WO03059272 | KR20030034177 | KR20050111593 | - BRZOSKA ET AL., BBRC, (2005), vol. 330, page 142 | - CAO ET AL., BBRC, (2005), vol. 332, page 370 | - SAFFORD ET AL., BBRC, (2002), vol. 294, page 371 | - OGAWA ET AL., BBRC, (2004), vol. 319, page 511 | - OGAWA ET AL., BBRC, (2004), vol. 313, page 871 | - BIOMATERIALS, (2004), vol. 25, page 3211 | - FUJIMURA ET AL., BBRC, (2005), vol. 333, page 116 | - INT. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 10, no. 3, page 275 |