EP2146634 - HEART FAILURE DETECTION USING RESPIRATION DISTRESS MANIFESTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, MN 55112-5798 / US | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALAL, Yousufali 18 Crockett Irvine, California 92620 / US | 02 /
HATLESTAD, John D. 2044 Edgerton Street Maplewood, Minnesota 55117 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yi 6070 Lanewood Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55446 / US | 04 /
LEWICKE, Aaron 7855 208th Street North Forest Lake, Minnesota 55025 / US | 05 /
STAHMANN, Jeffrey E. 4850 154th Lane NW Ramsey, Minnesota 55303 / US | [2014/13] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
DALAL, Yousufali 18 Crockett Irvine, California 92620 / US | ||
02 /
HATLESTAD, John D. 2044 Edgerton Street Maplewood, Minnesota 55117 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Yi 6070 Lanewood Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55446 / US | |||
04 /
LEWICKE, Aaron 7855 208th Street North Forest Lake, Minnesota 55025 / US | |||
05 /
STAHMANN, Jeffrey E. 4850 154th Lane NW Ramsey, Minnesota 55303 / US | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08754088.6 | 15.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008US04858 | Priority number, date | US20070736058 | 17.04.2007 Original published format: US 736058 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130549 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146634 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146634 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0205, A61B5/11, A61N1/362, // A61B5/08 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/1116 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/686 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/04] | A61B5/08, A61B5/113, A61N1/362 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON HERZINSUFFIZIENZ MITTELS MANIFESTATION VON ATEMNOT | [2010/04] | English: | HEART FAILURE DETECTION USING RESPIRATION DISTRESS MANIFESTATIONS | [2010/04] | French: | DÉTECTION D'UNE INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE À L'AIDE DE MANIFESTATIONS DE DÉTRESSE RESPIRATOIRE | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2013 | 24.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2008 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | IE | 15.04.2014 | LU | 15.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.04.2008 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
IE | 15.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005085738 (STAHMANN JEFFREY E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0044] , [0053] , [0055] , [0056] , [0067] , [0068] , [0140] , [0158] - [0167] - [0189]; figures 13,23 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP1582233 (PACESETTER INC [US]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0090] , [0091] , [0094] *; | [XY]WO2005018737 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * page 85, lines 3-19 * * page 107, line 6 - page 110, line 33 * [Y] 5; | [X]WO2006082589 (WIDEMED LTD [IL]; REISFELD DANIEL [IL]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * page 1, lines 9-14 * * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 24 *; | [PX]US2007213621 (REISFELD DANIEL [IL] ET AL) [PX] 1,2,4,6-9 * paragraphs [0029] , [0048] , [0054] , [0088] - [0098] * | Examination | - JIMISON H B ET AL, "Monitoring of body weight for heart failure patients: variability of weight and self-reporting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH. ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY. CANCUN, MEXICO, SEPT. 17 20030917; 20030917 - 20030921 NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/IEMBS.2003.1280950, (20030917), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-7789-9, pages 3665 - 3668, XP010694072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2003.1280950 |