EP2142431 - PACKAGE HAVING PHASE CHANGE MATERIALS AND METHOD OF USE IN TRANSPORT OF TEMPERATURE SENSITIVE PAYLOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entropy Solutions, Inc. 9827 Valley View Road Minneapolis, MN 55344-3527 / US | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Preston, Noel 9827 Valley View Road Minneapolis, MN 55344-3527 / US | 02 /
COUSINEAU III, Henry, Adolph 9827 Valley View Road Minneapolis, MN 55344-3527 / US | 03 /
HILLMAN, Arnold, Charles 9827 Valley View Road Minneapolis, MN 55344-3527 / US | 04 /
KRAMER, Christian, Peter 9827 Valley View Road Minneapolis, MN 55344-3527 / US | 05 /
LEGAS, David, Nicholas 9827 Valley View Road Minneapolis, MN 55344-3527 / US | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Spencer, Michael David, et al Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street GB-London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08755072.9 | 05.05.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008US62716 | Priority number, date | US20070916207P | 04.05.2007 Original published format: US 916207 P | US20070938622P | 17.05.2007 Original published format: US 938622 P | US20070939167P | 21.05.2007 Original published format: US 939167 P | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008137883 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2142431 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/22, B64G3/00, B65D81/38, F25D3/08 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
F25D3/08 (EP,US);
F25D2303/082 (EP,US);
F25D2303/0844 (EP,US);
F25D2303/0845 (EP,US);
F25D2303/085 (EP);
F25D2331/804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/02] | B64G1/22, B64G3/00, B65D81/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | PAKET MIT PHASENWECHSELMATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG BEIM TRANSPORT TEMPERATUREMPFINDLICHER LASTEN | [2010/02] | English: | PACKAGE HAVING PHASE CHANGE MATERIALS AND METHOD OF USE IN TRANSPORT OF TEMPERATURE SENSITIVE PAYLOAD | [2010/02] | French: | EMBALLAGE POSSEDANT MATERIAUX A CHANGEMENT DE PHASE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DANS TRANSPORT DE CHARGE UTILE SENSIBLE A LA TEMPERATURE | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 14.08.2013 | Observations by third parties | 11.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2015 | 31.05.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2016 | 31.05.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004151851 (MILLER DRAYTON [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 22] , [0 23] , [0 30]; figure 1 * [I] 9,12-15; | [X]US6482332 (MALACH TED J [CA]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 59]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2004231355 (MAYER WILLIAM N [US]) [X] 1-7,10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013]; figure 3 * | International search | [Y]US6482332 (MALACH TED J [CA]); | [X]US2004151851 (MILLER DRAYTON [US]) | other | US2004151851 | US6482332 |