EP2144823 - ONE-PIECE SQUEEZE AND TURN CHILD-RESISTANT CLOSURE AND CONTAINER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Global Pharmaceutical Packaging, Inc. 4350 Haddonfield Road, Suite 300 Pennsauken, NJ 08109 / US | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEAGER, Don, F. 134 W. Main Street Millville, NJ 08332 / US | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08755223.8 | 09.05.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US63224 | Priority number, date | US20070917428P | 11.05.2007 Original published format: US 917428 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141163 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144823 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D50/04 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
B65D50/046 (EP,US);
B65D50/04 (KR);
B65D55/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | EINTEILIGER UND KINDERSICHERER DRUCK- UND DREHVERSCHLUSS SOWIE BEHÄLTERSYSTEM | [2010/03] | English: | ONE-PIECE SQUEEZE AND TURN CHILD-RESISTANT CLOSURE AND CONTAINER SYSTEM | [2010/03] | French: | FERMETURE MONOBLOC À PRESSER ET À TOURNER À L'ÉPREUVE DES ENFANTS, ET SYSTÈME DE CONTENANT | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0751078 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,7-11 * abstract * [A] 14 [Y] 5,6,12,13,15; | [YA]NL7514515 (LEER KONINKLIJKE EMBALLAGE) [Y] 6,13 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,7-10; | [YA]WO9716358 (KERR GROUP INC [US]) [Y] 5,12 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [YA]US5603421 (OPRESCO OVIDIU [US]) [Y] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1 |