EP2151126 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING COMMERCE TRANSACTIONS IN AN INTERACTIVE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ice, L.L.C. 201 East 79th Street, Suite 71 New York, NY 10021 / US | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILTON, Antony A. 182 E. 95th Street New York, New York 10128 / US | 02 /
HILTON, Gregory L. 201 E 79th Street New York, New York 10075 / US | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08755331.9 | 12.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008US63456 | Priority number, date | US20070917557P | 11.05.2007 Original published format: US 917557 P | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008141298 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151126 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
H04N21/2542 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/306 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON HANDELSTRANSAKTIONEN IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN UMGEBUNG | [2010/06] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING COMMERCE TRANSACTIONS IN AN INTERACTIVE ENVIRONMENT | [2010/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR TRAITER DES TRANSACTIONS COMMERCIALES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INTERACTIF | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 05.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 27.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/24] | 23.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2003177497 (MACRAE DOUGLAS B [US], et al); | [A]US2006106699 (HITALENKO BORIS [US], et al); | [A]US2005065855 (GELLER BARRY IRA [US]); | [A]US2004010806 (YUEN HENRY C [US], et al); | [A]US2003041023 (GOLDSTEIN TIM [US], et al) | Examination | US2005086587 |