EP2149248 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHARING COMMON INTEREST LINKS BETWEEN COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMMARCO, Anthony 5601 Turner Glen Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27603 / US | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/05] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08755453.1 | 14.05.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US63601 | Priority number, date | US20070938154P | 15.05.2007 Original published format: US 938154 P | US20070955467 | 13.12.2007 Original published format: US 955467 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008144339 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2149248 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149248 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/40 (KR);
G06F15/16 (KR);
H04L67/52 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN VON GEMEINSAMEM INTERESSE ZWISCHEN KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄTEN | [2010/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHARING COMMON INTEREST LINKS BETWEEN COMMUNICATION DEVICES | [2010/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PARTAGE DE LIENS D'INTÉRÊT COMMUN ENTRE DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2008 | AT | 04.01.2012 | BE | 04.01.2012 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | HR | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SE | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | NO | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | IE | 14.05.2012 | LU | 14.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 14.05.2012 | ||
LU | 14.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 14.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 14.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 14.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 14.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.01.2012 | |
BE | 04.01.2012 | ||
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0022860 (DEGNBOL JANUS FRIIS [DK]) [X] 7,8,10-13,21,22,24 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line L * * page 12, line 4 - line L * * page 14, line 1 - line 11 * * page 19, line 7 - line 12 * [A] 9,23; | [X]US2002065883 (LUNSFORD E MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,17-20 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 3,4 *; | [XA]US2002087632 (KESKAR DHANANJAY V [US]) [X] 7,8,10-13,21,22,24 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0043] * [A] 9,23; | [XA]GB2375921 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 7,8,10-13,21,22,24 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, line L * * claim 1 * [A] 9,23; | [AD]US6922721 (MINBORG PER-AAKE [SE], et al) [AD] 1-24 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062] *; | [A]US2006234631 (DIEGUEZ JORGE [FR]) [A] 1,7,14,17,21* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * |