EP2155123 - FOAM PROSTHESIS FOR SPINAL DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promethean Surgical Devices, Llc 111 Roberts Street East Hartford, CT 06108 / US | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILBOCKER, Michael, T. 1110 Washington Street Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Jeffrey, A. 10 Wisteria Way Wrentham, MA 02093 / US | 03 /
ARCANGELI, Robert, M. 7 Jasper Street, Ext'n Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Bramley, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08755462.2 | 14.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US63612 | Priority number, date | US20070930064P | 14.05.2007 Original published format: US 930064 P | US20070930104P | 14.05.2007 Original published format: US 930104 P | US20070931407P | 22.05.2007 Original published format: US 931407 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141332 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155123 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30069 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30586 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30733 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | SCHAUMSTOFFPROTHESE FÜR EINE BANDSCHEIBE | [2010/08] | English: | FOAM PROSTHESIS FOR SPINAL DISC | [2010/08] | French: | PROTHÈSE DE MOUSSE POUR DISQUE VERTÉBRAL | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004097924 (LAMBRECHT GREGORY [US], et al); | [Y]US2005119752 (WILLIAMS MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US2005118228 (TRIEU HAI H [US]); | [Y]US2006149380 (LOTZ JEFFREY C [US], et al); | [Y]US2006241765 (BURN PETER J [NZ], et al) |