Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023261943 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 | US201916430358 | 03.06.2019 | US202318137680 | 21.04.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11637751 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2023 | B2 | US2019288912 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 | US201916430358 | 03.06.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10848347 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2020 | B2 | US2011149800 | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97093010 | 16.12.2010 | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2697769 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2016 | C | CA2697769 | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 | WO2008US63700 | 15.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2186260 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | B1 | EP2186260 | 22.05.2013 | A4 | EP2186260 | 19.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 | WO2008US63700 | 15.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009029303 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10313191 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2019 | B2 | US2009059930 | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84901007 | 31.08.2007 |