23.03.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
24.11.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
29.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
01.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
15.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|