Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017231422 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514607769 | 28.01.2015 | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | US201715586993 | 04.05.2017 | US60047210 | 08.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9907432 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2015272381 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514738824 | 12.06.2015 | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US60062710 | 13.04.2010 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9730547 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2017 | B2 | US2015144002 | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414580760 | 23.12.2014 | US60047810 | 19.01.2010 | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015144000 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514607769 | 28.01.2015 | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | US60047210 | 08.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8974846 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2015 | B2 | US2011070348 | 24.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | US60047208 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9084509 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2015 | B2 | US2010192779 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60062708 | 16.05.2008 | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9386877 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2016 | B2 | US2010147873 | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60058808 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8567304 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2013 | B2 | US2010147872 | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60051408 | 16.05.2008 | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8950317 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2015 | B2 | US2010147157 | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60047808 | 16.05.2008 | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10952562 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B2 | US2016278571 | 29.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615179436 | 10.06.2016 | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | US60058809 | 17.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101245077B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2013 | B1 | KR20100017846 | 16.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101229666B | Global Dossier | 04.02.2013 | B1 | KR20100032374 | 25.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101225896B | Global Dossier | 24.01.2013 | B1 | KR20100032373 | 25.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5148691B | Global Dossier | 20.02.2013 | B2 | JP2010531157 | 24.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5992141B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2016 | B2 | JP2010527701 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5148694B | Global Dossier | 20.02.2013 | B2 | JP2010527657 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5148693B | Global Dossier | 20.02.2013 | B2 | JP2010527656 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5148692B | Global Dossier | 20.02.2013 | B2 | JP2010527655 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3257763 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | EP08755631 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2155018 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | A4 | EP2155018 | 24.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2148817 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | A4 | EP2148817 | 03.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2148599 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | A4 | EP2148599 | 03.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2148598 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2017 | B1 | EP2148598 | 27.07.2016 | A4 | EP2148598 | 03.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2148818 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | A4 | EP2148818 | 03.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0811646 | 26.02.2019 | B1 | BRPI0811646 | 06.02.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0811647 | 02.01.2018 | A8 | BRPI0811647 | 03.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0811650 | 03.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0811652 | 26.12.2017 | A8 | BRPI0811652 | 03.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0811717 | 18.11.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2684130 | 25.03.2014 | C | CA2684130 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2684669 | 05.11.2013 | C | CA2684669 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2684850 | 29.10.2013 | C | CA2684850 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2684940 | 29.07.2014 | C | CA2684940 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2684941 | 11.02.2014 | C | CA2684941 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2778119 | 23.09.2014 | C | CA2778119 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | CA2684130 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2802138 | 28.10.2014 | C | CA2802138 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | CA2778119 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101742951B | 17.12.2014 | B | CN101742951 | 16.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101754704B | 26.09.2012 | B | CN101754704 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101754705B | 12.12.2012 | B | CN101754705 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101754899B | 05.10.2011 | B | CN101754899 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101754900B | 20.06.2012 | B | CN101754900 | 23.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2148598T | 09.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2637164T | 11.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2449420 | 21.10.2009 | B | GB2449420 | 11.02.2009 | A8 | GB2449420 | 26.11.2008 | A | GB0709585D0 | 27.06.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2449421 | 09.09.2009 | B | GB2449421 | 11.02.2009 | A8 | GB2449421 | 26.11.2008 | A | GB0709586D0 | 27.06.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2449630 | 06.01.2010 | B | GB2449630 | 11.02.2009 | A8 | GB2449630 | 03.12.2008 | A | GB0709588D0 | 27.06.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2449422 | 16.09.2009 | B | GB2449422 | 28.01.2009 | A8 | GB2449422 | 26.11.2008 | A | GB0709589D0 | 27.06.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2449213 | 29.06.2011 | B | GB2449213 | 19.11.2008 | A | GB0709590D0 | 27.06.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1144538 | 25.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63833 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1145008 | 25.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63831 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1145078 | 01.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63827 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1145163 | 08.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US63832 | 16.05.2008 | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1145394 | 15.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2148598T | 29.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | EP08755631 | 16.05.2008 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | WO2008US63818 | 16.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144471 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144470 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144469 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2009 | A3 | WO2008144469 | 27.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144468 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144462 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101218432B | Global Dossier | 03.01.2013 | B1 | KR20100017847 | 16.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101210771B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2012 | B1 | KR20100020973 | 23.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017056226 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015042319 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014208269 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103750746 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104382496 | 04.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2463350 | 28.07.2010 | B | GB2463350 | 17.03.2010 | A | GB0914686D0 | 30.09.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0914686 | 18.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2462392 | 18.08.2010 | B | GB2462392 | 10.02.2010 | A | GB0920042D0 | 30.12.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | GB0920042 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1197166 | 09.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1207546 | 05.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2148598T | 04.10.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2431440 | 20.10.2011 | C2 | RU2009146994 | 27.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709589 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2448634 | 27.04.2012 | C2 | RU2009146995 | 27.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709590 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2435712 | 10.12.2011 | C2 | RU2009146997 | 27.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | GB0709585 | 18.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2454164 | 27.06.2012 | C2 | RU2009147024 | 27.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709588 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2435729 | 10.12.2011 | C2 | RU2009147029 | 27.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0709586 | 18.05.2007 | US94011807 | 25.05.2007 |