EP2163111 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCESS MOBILITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/11] | PROTOCOL ARCHITECTURE FOR ACCESS MOBILITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | ||
[2015/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKHERJEE, Rajat, P. 3620 Lorne Crescent, Apt 717 Montreal, Québec H2X 2B1 / CA | 02 /
OLVERA-HERNANDEZ, Ulises 2 Rolland Laniel Kirkland, Québec H9J 4A5 / CA | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Hansson, Anders Max, et al Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89 P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Ahrengart, Kenneth Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08756157.7 | 23.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008US64614 | Priority number, date | US20070940230P | 25.05.2007 Original published format: US 940230 P | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008147933 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163111 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04L29/06 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H04W36/005 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04L69/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/40 (KR);
H04W36/0011 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/18 (KR);
H04W80/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | H04W48/18, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2010/11] | H04Q7/20, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ZUGANGSMOBILITÄT BEI DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATION | [2015/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACCESS MOBILITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2015/26] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL DE MOBILITE D'ACCES DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2015/26] |
Former [2010/11] | PROTOKOLLARCHITEKTUR FÜR ZUGANGSMOBILITÄT BEI DER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | ||
Former [2010/11] | PROTOCOL ARCHITECTURE FOR ACCESS MOBILITY IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | ||
Former [2010/11] | ARCHITECTURE DE PROTOCOLE DE MOBILITE D'ACCES DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007072605 (POCZO GABRIELLA R [US]); | by applicant | US2007072605 |