EP2162435 - Ionic liquids as electrolytes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/11] | IONIC LIQUIDS AS ELECTROLYTES | ||
[2013/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.à.r.l. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Kreuzackerstrasse 9 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.A R.L. Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Pestalozzistrasse 2 9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Invista Technologies S.A.R.L. Intellectual Property Record Center Three Little Falls Centre - Rm 1052 2801 Centerville Road Wilmington, Delaware 19806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSYTH, Stewart 40 Annadale Green Belfast, BT73DQ / IE | 02 /
SEDDON, Kenneth, R. The Queen's University Of Belfast Stranmillis Road Belfast, BT95AG / IE | 03 /
WHISTON, Keith 12 Hartford Road Darlington Durham DL3 8EY / GB | [2013/36] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
FORSYTH, Stewart 40 Annadale Green Belfast, BT73DQ / IE | ||
02 /
SEDDON, Kenneth, R. The Queen's University Of Belfast Stranmillis Road Belfast, BT95AG / IE | |||
03 /
WHISTON, Keith 12 Hartford Road Darlington Durham DL3 8EY / GB | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/36] |
Former [2010/11] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08756424.1 | 29.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008US65048 | Priority number, date | US20070941406P | 01.06.2007 Original published format: US 941406 P | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008150842 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2162435 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162435 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/14, C07D223/04, C25B3/00 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
C07D211/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D223/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25B3/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | Ionische Flüssigkeiten als Elektrolyte | [2013/14] | English: | Ionic liquids as electrolytes | [2013/14] | French: | Liquides ioniques utilisés comme électrolytes | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/11] | IONISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITEN ALS ELEKTROLYTE | ||
Former [2010/11] | IONIC LIQUIDS AS ELECTROLYTES | ||
Former [2010/11] | LIQUIDES IONIQUES UTILISÉS COMME ÉLECTROLYTES | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2008 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | GB | 29.05.2014 | IE | 29.05.2014 | LU | 29.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.05.2008 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006072785 (UNIV BELFAST [GB], et al) [X] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [X]JP2005347176 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 04, Database accession no. 2006-034220, XP002491548 & JP2005347176 A 20051215 (TOMIYAMA YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1,12,13,16 * abstract * | [X] - F. POTMISCHIL ET AL, "Saturated amine oxides: part 8. Hydroacridines", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN CHEMISTRY, JOHN WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (200701), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0749-1581, pages 231 - 235, XP002491544 [X] 1,2,4,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrc.1951 | [X] - YOSHIDA, AKIYOSHI ET AL, "Aromatic basic ethers with antispasmodic activity. I. Synthesis and anticholinergic activities of 3-(N,N-disubstituted amino)-1-phenylpropyl phenyl ether derivatives", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1973:418270, URL: STN, XP002491545 [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [X] - YANINA, A. D. ET AL, "Hofmann cleavage of 1-azabicyclo[3.2.1]octane", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1959:122178, URL: STN, XP002491546 [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [X] - YANINA, A. D. ET AL, "Hofmann cleavage of 1-azabicyclo[3.2.1]octanes. II. Cleavage of 7-methyl-1-azabicyclo[3.2.1]octane", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1960:128944, URL: STN, XP002491547 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - BLICKE F F ET AL, "Polycyclic Quarternary Ammonium Salts. III", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, US, (19540101), vol. 76, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5099 - 5103, XP002459655 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01649a027 | Examination | EP0628585 | US2006223995 | - MILLINI R ET AL, "Zeolite synthesis in the presence of azonia-spiro compounds as structure-directing agents", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, (19981125), vol. 24, no. 4-6, doi:DOI:10.1016/S1387-1811(98)00165-6, ISSN 1387-1811, pages 199 - 211, XP004142637 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1387-1811(98)00165-6 | by applicant | US7157588 | WO2006136529 | WO2006072785 |