EP2162637 - RECIPROCATING BELT DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bronson, Henry D. 9040 St. Stephens Green Oak Brook, IL 60523 / US | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08756572.7 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008US65423 | Priority number, date | US20070932444P | 31.05.2007 Original published format: US 932444 P | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008151084 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2162637 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162637 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/06, B62M9/00, B62M9/06, F16G1/28, F16G5/20, F16H7/02 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B62K3/002 (EP,US);
B62M1/24 (EP,US);
F16H31/00 (EP,US);
F16H7/023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | F16H7/06, B62M9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | HUBRIEMENANTRIEB | [2010/11] | English: | RECIPROCATING BELT DRIVE | [2010/11] | French: | TRANSMISSION PAR COURROIE EN VA-ET-VIENT | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 06.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2008 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | HR | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | NO | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | GB | 30.05.2012 | IE | 30.05.2012 | LU | 30.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
LU | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4411442 (RILLS NOLAN J [US]) [A] 1,9,16* the whole document *; | [A]US4846489 (KLEINEBENNE DIETER [DE]) [A] 1,9,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0677682 (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]) [A] 1,9,16 * column 4, line 28 - column 7, line 12; figures 1,1a-1e,2,3,4b,6 *; | [A]US6334838 (LEE JAMES [TW]) [A] 1,9,16 * column 1, line 11 - line 56; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10119495 (GUENTHER ROLF [DE]) [A] 1,9,16 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] - [0015] - [0016]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2005119087 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,16 * page 7 - page 10; figures 1,3,4 * | International search | [A]KR930007669B (ANDERSON CYRIL F [US]); | [X]US5772546 (WARSZEWSKI JAROSLAW PIOTR [DE]); | [A]KR200251543Y ; | [A]US6402651 (SHIRLEY CHESTER LEE [US]) |