EP2173931 - FIBREFILL FIBRE HAVING IMPROVED OPENING CHARACTERISTICS, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄNNER, Johann Gahbergstrasse 6 A-4852 Weyregg / AT | 02 /
JARY, Susanne Seefeld 66 A-4853 Steinbach / AT | 03 /
IVANOFF, Denitza Katzenberg 11 A-4904 Atzbach / AT | 04 /
DOBSON, Peter 2 Brook Road Borrowash Derby DE72 3FW / GB | 05 /
HAGER, Markus Sicking 48 A-4800 Attnang / AT | 06 /
FIRGO, Heinrich Billroth-Strasse 4 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [2012/05] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
MÄNNER, Johann Gahbergstrasse 6 A-4852 Weyregg / AT | ||
02 /
JARY, Susanne Seefeld 66 A-4853 Steinbach / AT | |||
03 /
IVANOFF, Denitza Katzenberg 11 A-4904 Atzbach / AT | |||
04 /
DOBSON, Peter 2 Brook Road Borrowash Derby DE72 3FW / GB | |||
05 /
HAGER, Markus Sicking 48 A-4800 Attnang / AT | |||
06 /
FIRGO, Heinrich Billroth-Strasse 4 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | Representative(s) | Hanemann, Otto Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | [2012/05] |
Former [2010/15] | Hanemann, Otto Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | Application number, filing date | 08756846.5 | 27.06.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008AT00237 | Priority number, date | AT20070001082 | 11.07.2007 Original published format: AT 10822007 | [2010/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009006656 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2173931 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2173931 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D01F2/00, D02G1/12, D06M15/643 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
D02G1/12 (EP,KR,US);
D01F2/00 (KR);
B68G1/00 (EP,KR,US);
D01D1/02 (KR);
D01D10/02 (KR);
D01D5/04 (KR);
D01D5/06 (KR);
D01D5/26 (KR);
D06M15/6436 (EP,KR,US);
D10B2501/00 (KR);
D10B2503/06 (KR);
Y10T428/2907 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2924 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | FÜLLFASER MIT VERBESSERTEM ÖFFNUNGSVERHALTEN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2010/15] | English: | FIBREFILL FIBRE HAVING IMPROVED OPENING CHARACTERISTICS, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2010/15] | French: | FIBRES DE GARNISSAGE À COMPORTEMENT À L'OUVERTURE AMÉLIORÉ, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2008 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | HR | 01.02.2012 | IE | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | NO | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | LU | 27.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
LU | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 01.02.2012 | |
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 01.02.2012 | |
HR | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 01.02.2012 | |
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NO | 01.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1458319 (KURARAY CO) [A] 3-5,9-11 * page 1, lines 8-11,45-48 * * page 2, line 16 - line 24 *; | [Y]GB1491747 (TEIJIN LTD) [Y] 3-5,9-11 * page 1, line 5 - line 6 * * page 2, line 10 - line 24 * * page 4, line 44 - line 51; claims 1,20 *; | [XY]WO9428220 (COURTAULDS FIBRES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * page 1, line 2 - line 7 * * page 5, line 23 - line 25 * * page 6, line 18 - line 21; figures 1-3 * * page 5, lines 14-16 * * page 1, line 20 * * page 2, line 32 - line 33 * * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 1 * * page 3, line 2 - line 4 * * page 6, line 2 - line 3 * * page 4, line 4 - line 5 * * page 6, line 29 * [Y] 3-5,9-11; | [XY]WO9524520 (COURTAULDS FIBRES HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 4 - line 5 * * page 7, lines 10-16,33,34 * * page 7, line 13 - line 15; figure 1 * * page 4, line 10 - line 22 * * page 5, lines 1-3 * [Y] 3-5,9-11; | [A]WO9916705 (FIBRETECH LIMITED [GB], et al) [A] 13-16 * page 1 - page 3 ** claims 1,4,10,11 *; | [A]DE19858353 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 3-5,9-11 * page 2, lines 8,9 * * page 6, line 38 - line 39; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004088010 (ZIMMER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 1; figures 1-3 * * page 5 * * page 6 * * page 8 - page 15 * |