EP2146467 - RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD, BEARING DEVICE AND BEARING CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Yangbo Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property dept. B1-3A, Bantan Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08757585.8 | 03.06.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008CN71174 | Priority number, date | CN20071112305 | 04.06.2007 Original published format: CN200710112305 | [2010/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008148347 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146467 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
H04L47/822 (EP);
H04L47/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RESOURCENVERWALTUNG, TRÄGERGERÄT UND TRÄGERKONTROLLGERÄT | [2010/03] | English: | RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD, BEARING DEVICE AND BEARING CONTROL DEVICE | [2010/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES, DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SUPPORT | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2009 | Translation filed | 09.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1739922 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * claims 1,5 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1742436 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] * * claims 1-4 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Policy and charging control architecture (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.203, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070301), no. V7.2.0, pages 1 - 72, XP050363011 [X] 1-10 * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 3.3 * * page 13, paragraph 4.3 - page 14, paragraph 4.3.3.3 * * page 20, paragraph 6.1.5 * * page 21, paragraph 6.2 - page 28, paragraph 6.2.2.3 * * page 30, paragraph 6.3 - page 35, paragraph 6.4 * | International search | [A]CN1402451 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1545288 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [X]CN1881960 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1968326 (ALCATEL SHANGHAI BELL CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2007116018 (DOLEH AHMED [US], et al) |