EP2145061 - CEILING JOIST FORMWORK WITH AUTOMATIC STRIPPING OF THE INNER BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peri GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWÖRER, Artur Am Waldblick 7 89250 Senden / DE | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08757925.6 | 02.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008DE00555 | Priority number, date | DE20071016724 | 07.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007016724 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008122273 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145061 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145061 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04G13/06 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
E04G13/06 (EP,US);
E04G13/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | UNTERZUGSCHALUNG MIT AUTOMATISCHER ENTSCHALUNG DES INNENSCHILDS | [2010/03] | English: | CEILING JOIST FORMWORK WITH AUTOMATIC STRIPPING OF THE INNER BOARD | [2010/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COFFRAGE DE PLANCHER À DÉCOFFRAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA BANCHE INTÉRIEURE | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 24.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2008 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | HR | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1803626 (BOURGE EDMOND) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2 * * figure 5 *; | [A]DE19813857 (PERI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE10038659 (PERI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A] - Doka Extra, User Information, Method Statement, AMSTETTEN, ÖSTEREICHISCHE DOKA, (200410), XP002493219 [A] 1 * page 13 * |