EP2158464 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states Hochschule Mannheim Windeckstrasse 110 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
For all designated states Hochschule Mannheim Windeckstrasse 110 68163 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEUERMANN, Alexander Insterburger Strasse 35b 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
HÜBNER, Christof Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 38 68535 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | 03 /
WÖRSCHING, Holger Zimikerstrasse 5 CH-8610 Uster / CH | 04 /
BIEBERSTEIN, Andreas Rolandstrasse 38 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | 05 /
SCHLAEGER, Stefan Lammbergweg 23 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | 06 /
SCHUHMANN, Rainer Eisvogelweg 9 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | 07 /
BECKER, Rolf Schuldamm 10 D-47546 Kalkar / DE | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
SCHEUERMANN, Alexander Insterburger Strasse 35b 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
HÜBNER, Christof Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 38 68535 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | |||
03 /
WÖRSCHING, Holger Zimikerstrasse 5 CH-8610 Uster / CH | |||
04 /
BIEBERSTEIN, Andreas Rolandstrasse 38 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLAEGER, Stefan Lammbergweg 23 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | |||
06 /
SCHUHMANN, Rainer Eisvogelweg 9 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
07 /
BECKER, Rolf Meissener Strasse 10 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
SCHEUERMANN, Alexander Insterburger Strasse 35b 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
HÜBNER, Christof Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 38 68535 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | |||
03 /
WÖRSCHING, Holger Moltkestrasse 129 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
04 /
BIEBERSTEIN, Andreas Rolandstrasse 38 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLAEGER, Stefan Lammbergweg 23 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | |||
06 /
SCHUHMANN, Rainer Eisvogelweg 9 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
07 /
BECKER, Rolf Meissener Strasse 10 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Pietruk, Claus Peter, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Pietruk, Claus Peter Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 08758041.1 | 08.05.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008DE00783 | Priority number, date | DE20071022039 | 08.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022039 | [2010/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008135040 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158464 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
G01L1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVE KRAFTSENSORANORDNUNG | [2010/09] | English: | SENSOR ARRANGEMENT | [2010/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0107012 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11 * page 3, line 6 - line 12 * * page 3, line 20 - line 26; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [Y] 5,9,12; | [Y]EP0633460 (MUELLER SEPP [DE]) [Y] 5,9,12 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]AT355836B (SEMPERIT AG [AT]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2245977 (WREDE & NIEDECKEN VERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 8 - line 22; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]US2005024210 (MAKI MELVIN C [CA]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | US6956381 | JPH1062368 | DE69300419T | EP0628161 | US6838622 | AT355836B | EP0107012 | - S. SCHLAEGER, "A fast TDRinversion technique for the reconstruction of spatial soil moisture content", HYDROLOGY AN EARTH SYSTEM SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 9, pages 481 - 492 | - "Empfehlung des Arbeitskreises 3.3 -Versuchstechnik Fels der Deutschen Gesellschaft für Geotechnik e.V.: Messung der Spannungsänderung im Fels und an Felsbauwerken", PAUL A. WALTER, Druckkissen- Bautechnik, vol. 81, pages 639 - 647 |