EP2167143 - A BODY WASTE COLLECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Corporate Patents Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Corporate Patents Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACH, Anders Stenlandsvej 5 2300 København S / DK | 02 /
STROEBECH, Esben Selmersvej 11 DK-2970 Hoersholm / DK | 03 /
LYKKE, Mads Havrevej 30 DK-2700 Broenshoej / DK | [2010/15] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
BACH, Anders Markmandsgade 12, 4th. DK-2300 København S / DK | ||
02 /
STROEBECH, Esben Selmersvej 11 DK-2970 Hoersholm / DK | |||
03 /
LYKKE, Mads Havrevej 30 DK-2700 Broenshoej / DK | Application number, filing date | 08758280.5 | 17.06.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008DK50143 | Priority number, date | DK20070000895 | 19.06.2007 Original published format: DK 200700895 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008154928 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167143 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/04, A61L15/58, A61F5/445 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
A61L24/0031 (EP,US);
A61L24/043 (EP,US);
A61L2400/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L24/043, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
A61L24/043, C08L83/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFFANGEN VON KÖRPERSCHLACKEN | [2010/13] | English: | A BODY WASTE COLLECTING DEVICE | [2010/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF COLLECTEUR DE DÉCHETS CORPORELS | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP1679085 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [DY] 1-31 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011]; examples 1-12; tables 1,2 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] *; | WO2005032401 [ ] (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]US4231369 (SORENSEN ERIK L, et al) [Y] 1-31 * column A * * column 3, line 45 - line 63; claims 1,3,4 *; | [YD]EP1424088 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [YD] 1-31 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] *; | [PX]WO2007128320 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-31 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 9 * * page 9, line 8 - line 23 * * page 11, line 14 - line 32 * * page 17, line 31 - page 19, line 11 * * page 21, line 16 - line 26; claims 9-21 *; | [E]WO2008074333 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [E] 1-31 * abstract *; | [DA]WO02066087 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [DA] 12,15 * abstract * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph L * |