EP2144655 - DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHRSCHNEIDER, Marc Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Joern-Eric Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 03 /
BESSELER, Jens Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
VON BRUNN, Timo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 05 /
THOEMMES, Ralf Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 06 /
REINHOLD, Thomas, Sowden Feldstiege 4 48161 Muenster / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
ROHRSCHNEIDER, Marc Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
02 /
SCHULZ, Joern-Eric Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03 /
BESSELER, Jens Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
04 /
VON BRUNN, Timo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
05 /
THOEMMES, Ralf Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
06 /
REINHOLD, Thomas, Sowden Feldstiege 4 48161 Muenster / DE | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Häckel, Stefan Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert, Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08758560.0 | 15.05.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008EP03925 | Priority number, date | EP20070009801 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07009801 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008138631 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2144655 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2144655 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
A61M15/0045 (EP,US);
A61M11/001 (EP,US);
A61M11/02 (EP,US);
A61M15/0026 (EP,US);
A61M15/0036 (EP,US);
A61M15/0048 (EP,US);
A61M15/005 (EP,US);
A61M15/0061 (EP,US);
A61M15/0075 (EP,US);
A61M15/0081 (EP,US);
A61M15/0091 (EP,US);
A61M15/0096 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
A61M2205/07 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8225 (EP,US);
A61M2206/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDERVORRICHTUNG | [2010/03] | English: | DISPENSING DEVICE | [2010/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION | [2015/16] |
Former [2010/03] | DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 22.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2008 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | IE | 15.05.2016 | LU | 15.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 15.05.2008 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.05.2008 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.05.2008 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007018568 (MANTA DEVICES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1A,1B * * figures 3A,3B * * figures 7A,7B * * figures 9A,9B * * figures 10A,10B * * figure 12B * * page 3, line 5 - line 10 * * page 5, line 20 * * page 7, lines 9-14 * * page 9, line 4 - line 9 * * page 17, line 27 - line 31 * * page 21, line 1 - line 8 * * page 21, line 18 - line 20 * * claim 15 *; | [A]WO0117595 (INNOVATA BIOMED LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2005002654 (MERIDICA LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * |