|
06.03.2018 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
28.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.07.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.02.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
25 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |