29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
16.02.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
23.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
10.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.12.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
15.06.2016 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
15.02.2016 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
15.02.2016 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2015 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
11.03.2015 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
04.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.02.2015 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
13.02.2015 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
12.12.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
12.12.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
09.07.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2012 |
First examination report |
|
05.04.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
10.03.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.02.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
05.02.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|