EP2149072 - A GUM SOLUTION FOR DEVELOPING AND GUMMING A PHOTOPOLYMER PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/05] | A GUM SOLUTION FOR DEVELOPING AND GUMMING A PHOTOPOLYMER PRINTING PLATE. | ||
[2010/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIES, Willi-Kurt General Mudra-strasse 27 D-55252 Mainz-kastel / DE | 02 /
HENDRIKX, Peter Agfa Graphics NV IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
VAN DAMME, Marc Agfa Graphics NV IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Goedeweeck, Rudi AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Goedeweeck, Rudi Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 08759565.8 | 14.05.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008EP55872 | Priority number, date | EP20070108228 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: EP 07108228 | US20070938015P | 15.05.2007 Original published format: US 938015 P | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008138942 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149072 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149072 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/32 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
G03F7/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | GUMMILÖSUNG ZUM ENTWICKELN UND GUMMIEREN EINER PHOTOPOLYMERDRUCKPLATTE | [2010/05] | English: | A GUM SOLUTION FOR DEVELOPING AND GUMMING A PHOTOPOLYMER PRINTING PLATE | [2010/36] | French: | SOLUTION DE GOMME DESTINÉE AU DÉVELOPPEMENT ET AU GOMMAGE D'UNE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION PHOTOPOLYMÈRE | [2010/05] |
Former [2010/05] | A GUM SOLUTION FOR DEVELOPING AND GUMMING A PHOTOPOLYMER PRINTING PLATE. | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 19.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HR | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | MT | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | NO | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | IE | 14.05.2011 | LU | 14.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.05.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.05.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.05.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
HR | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
NO | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1103859 (KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS CO [US]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO2005111727 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1602982 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]EP1621339 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]EP1650605 (AZ ELECTRONIC MATERIALS USA [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0042] , [0045] *; | [DA]EP1755002 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-12 * paragraphs [0009] , [0036] - [0038] - [0045] , [0051] , [0177] , [0203]; claims 5,11 * |