EP2164726 - GAS FLOW DISTRIBUTOR FOR AN AIRBAG MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takata AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Takata-Petri AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNIN, Carlo Finkenweg 43 89551 Königsbronn / DE | 02 /
RIST, Holger Hahnenweilerstraße 22 89160 Dornstadt / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Nico Gemeindegasse 193 09477 Jöhstadt / DE | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08759927.0 | 22.05.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008EP56326 | Priority number, date | DE20072007355U | 22.05.2007 Original published format: DE 202007007355 U | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008142142 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2164726 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164726 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/231, B60R21/235 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B60R21/2346 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R21/2338 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23123 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23386 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2358 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2359 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | GASSTROMVERTEILER FÜR EIN GASSACKMODUL | [2010/12] | English: | GAS FLOW DISTRIBUTOR FOR AN AIRBAG MODULE | [2010/12] | French: | REPARTITEUR DE FLUX GAZEUX POUR UN MODULE SAC GONFLABLE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 26.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11172662.6 / EP2374668 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2008 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | HR | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | MT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | NO | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | ES | 17.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
MT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
HR | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0020260 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 26 * page 5, lines 30-33; figures 3-8 *; | [XY]US2001019201 (MASUDA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,14,16-23,28-30 * paragraph [0053]; figures 10,11 * [Y] 15; | [Y]EP1310409 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [Y] 15,19-25 * figure - *; | [Y]EP1462321 (KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 22,23 * figures 2,3,6 *; | [A]US2006163849 (KESHAVARAJ RAMESH [US]) [A] 18 * figure 7a *; | [Y]DE102005015078 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 22-25 * figure - *; | [Y]US2006255570 (WIPASURAMONTON PONGDET P [US], et al) [Y] 19-25 * figure 6 *; | [X]DE20321395U (TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0012]; figure - *; | [PX]WO2007078500 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,9-15* paragraph [0016]; figure - * | by applicant | US2001019201 |