EP2158193 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ALKYL-SUBSTITUTED THIOPHENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/09] | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SUBSTITUTED HETEROAROMATES | ||
[2012/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saltigo GmbH Katzbergstrasse 1 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIERONYMI, Antje Gellertstrasse 22 50733 Köln / DE | 02 /
RODEFELD, Lars Am Scherfenbrand 110A 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LIP-IPR LANXESS Tower Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08760040.9 | 27.05.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008EP56442 | Priority number, date | DE20071026763 | 09.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007026763 | [2010/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008151920 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2158193 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158193 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/08 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
C07D333/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ALKYLSUBSTITUIERTER THIOPHENE | [2012/22] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ALKYL-SUBSTITUTED THIOPHENES | [2012/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉS THIOPHÈNES ALCOYLÉS | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/09] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SUBSTITUIERTER HETEROAROMATEN | ||
Former [2010/09] | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SUBSTITUTED HETEROAROMATES | ||
Former [2010/09] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROAROMATIQUES SUBSTITUÉS | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 28.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2008 | CY | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MC | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | NO | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 08.08.2012 | |
NO | 08.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2006155134 (WERNER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - TAMAO K ET AL, "Nickel-phosphine complex-catalysed Grignard coupling - II", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19820101), vol. 38, no. 22, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 3347 - 3354, XP002251876 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(82)80117-8 | by applicant | US2006155134 | - KUMADA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1982), vol. 38, pages 3347 - 3354 | - ZIMMER, SYNTH COMMUN., (1986), vol. 16, pages 689 - 696 |