EP2155376 - METHOD OF RECHARGING THE REACTION TUBE OF A TUBE-BUNDLE REACTOR WITH A NEW CATALYST FIXED BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Revocation of patent | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLIEPHAKE, Volker Kaiser-Konrad-Str. 29 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 02 /
BOTT, Klaus Heinz-Schifferdecker-Str. 12 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
BECHER, Rolf-Dieter Gralsstr. 20 68199 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER-ENGEL, Klaus Joachim Bahnhofstr. 82 76297 Stutensee / DE | 05 /
PETZOLDT, Jochen Dackenheimer Weg 5 67273 Weisenheim am Berg / DE | 06 /
CREMER, Ulrich R7, 39 68161 Mannheim / DE | 07 /
RAICHLE, Andreas Hagellochstrasse 74a 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 08760298.3 | 30.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008EP56711 | Priority number, date | DE20071025869 | 01.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007025869 | US20070941385P | 01.06.2007 Original published format: US 941385 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008145739 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155376 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155376 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/06 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B01J8/0045 (EP,US);
C07C51/252 (US);
B01J8/06 (EP,US);
B08B9/0436 (EP,US);
C07C45/35 (US);
B01J2208/00761 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN DER WIEDERBESCHICKUNG DER REAKTIONSROHRE EINES ROHRBÜNDELREAKTORS MIT EINEM NEUEN KATALYSATORFESTBETT | [2010/08] | English: | METHOD OF RECHARGING THE REACTION TUBE OF A TUBE-BUNDLE REACTOR WITH A NEW CATALYST FIXED BED | [2010/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À RECHARGER LES TUBES DE RÉACTION D'UN RÉACTEUR À FAISCEAU DE TUBES AVEC UN NOUVEAU LIT CATALYTIQUE SOLIDE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2013
16.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | 02
11.04.2013
17.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Perstorp Formox AB 284 80 Perstorp / SE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2013
16.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
02
11.04.2013
17.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Perstorp Formox AB 284 80 Perstorp / SE Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 16.05.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2015 | 23.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.11.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/01] | Appeal following opposition | 23.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T2062/15 | 24.11.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2008 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MC | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | NO | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | AT | 30.05.2013 | GB | 30.05.2013 | IE | 30.05.2013 | LU | 30.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.05.2013 | ||
GB | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
GB | 30.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 11.07.2012 | |
NO | 11.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9802239 (BOOY SUPPORT BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1, lines 6-19 * * page 2, lines 30-33 * * page 6, lines 15-21 * * figure 1; claim 7 *; | [X]WO2005082522 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, lines 9-25 * * page 6, lines 18-21 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 10 * * page 11, lines 25-29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10353617 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0042] , [0043] *; | [AD]US4701101 (SAPOFF PAUL C [US]) [AD] 1-7 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 14 * |