EP2156529 - VOLTAGE MEASUREMENTS OF ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING ELEMENTS IN SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING ELECTRICAL PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/15] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJÖRKLUND, Hans Plommonstigen 23 S-77143 Ludvika / SE | 02 /
NYBERG, Kryster Hagelvägen 3 S-77733 Ludvika / SE | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Axell, Kristina, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/08] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 T2 Floor E 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 08760340.3 | 02.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008EP56753 | Priority number, date | US20070929001P | 07.06.2007 Original published format: US 929001 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008148727 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156529 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2156529 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/00, G01R15/04, // G01R15/06 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
H02H1/0007 (EP,US);
G01R15/04 (EP,US);
G01R15/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | H02H1/00, G01R15/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSMESSUNG ELEKTRISCH LEITENDER ELEMENTE IN SYSTEMEN ZUR STEUERUNG ELEKTRISCHER PROZESSE | [2010/08] | English: | VOLTAGE MEASUREMENTS OF ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING ELEMENTS IN SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING ELECTRICAL PROCESSES | [2010/08] | French: | MESURES DE TENSION D'ÉLÉMENTS ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTEURS DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2017/12] |
Former [2010/08] | MESURES DE TENSION D'ELEMENTS ELECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTEURS DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS ELECTRIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 24.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2008 | AT | 24.05.2017 | CY | 24.05.2017 | CZ | 24.05.2017 | EE | 24.05.2017 | ES | 24.05.2017 | FI | 24.05.2017 | HR | 24.05.2017 | IT | 24.05.2017 | LT | 24.05.2017 | LV | 24.05.2017 | MC | 24.05.2017 | NL | 24.05.2017 | PL | 24.05.2017 | PT | 24.05.2017 | RO | 24.05.2017 | SI | 24.05.2017 | SK | 24.05.2017 | TR | 24.05.2017 | IE | 02.06.2017 | LU | 02.06.2017 | MT | 02.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | BG | 24.08.2017 | GR | 25.08.2017 | IS | 24.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.06.2008 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
TR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.06.2008 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CY | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.06.2008 | |
AT | 24.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
MC | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
MT | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SI | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
IE | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
LU | 02.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
IT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
PL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
CZ | 24.05.2017 | ||
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
RO | 24.05.2017 | ||
SK | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
EE | 24.05.2017 | ||
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
NL | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
LV | 24.05.2017 | ||
BG | 24.08.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 24.05.2017 | |
ES | 24.05.2017 | ||
FI | 24.05.2017 | ||
HR | 24.05.2017 | ||
LT | 24.05.2017 | ||
GR | 25.08.2017 | ||
IS | 24.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2437626 (ALSTHOM CGEE) [X] 1-6,8-14 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [X]CH257302 (BERGER KARL DR [CH]) [X] 1,2,12 * page 1, line 15 - line 62; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2006012382 (YAKYMYSHYN CHRISTOPHER P [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US3114078 (PAUL WALDVOGEL, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 13; figure 3 *; | [A]DE29501280U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 7 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 15 * |