EP2167853 - HIGH PRESSURE DIAPHRAGM VALVE WITH EXCHANGEABLE SEAT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUXEMBOURG PATENT COMPANY S.A. 24, route de Diekirch 7440 Lintgen / LU | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIT, Jeannot 3, rue des Jardins L-7440 LINTGEN / LU | 02 /
KREMER, Paul 7, rue de la Libération L-7236 WALFERDANGE / LU | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger, et al P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Office Freylinger, et al P.O. Box 48 L-8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 08760959.0 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008EP57424 | Priority number, date | EP20070110131 | 12.06.2007 Original published format: EP 07110131 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152110 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167853 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167853 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/17 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
F16K7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKMEMBRANVENTIL MIT AUSTAUSCHBARER SITZANORDNUNG | [2010/13] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE DIAPHRAGM VALVE WITH EXCHANGEABLE SEAT ASSEMBLY | [2010/13] | French: | VANNE À MEMBRANE À HAUTE PRESSION POURVUE D'UN ENSEMBLE SUPPORT ÉCHANGEABLE | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2008 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | HR | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | NO | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | IE | 12.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
IE | 12.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB712856 (VICKERS ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [A] 1,14 * page 3; figure . *; | [A]GB2078344 (WEBER SPA) [A] 1,14 * page 1 - page 2; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP1281898 (FUJIKIN KK [JP]) [DA] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10341175 (HEMSING SACHVERSTAENDIGENBUERO [DE]) [A] 1,14* abstract * |