EP2170653 - METHOD AND CONTROL APPLIANCE FOR TRIGGERING PASSENGER PROTECTION MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOERR, Alfons Orplidstr. 8 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HIEMER, Marcus Stuttgarter Strasse 69/3 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2010/14] | Application number, filing date | 08761012.7 | 13.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008EP57491 | Priority number, date | DE20071030313 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007030313 | [2010/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003827 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170653 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/013 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND STEUERGERÄT ZUR ANSTEUERUNG VON PERSONENSCHUTZMITTELN | [2010/14] | English: | METHOD AND CONTROL APPLIANCE FOR TRIGGERING PASSENGER PROTECTION MEANS | [2010/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR LE DÉCLENCHEMENT D'ORGANES DE PROTECTION DES OCCUPANTS | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6173224 (RIESNER MILOSLAV [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 55 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19619412 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 50 - page 7, line 47 *; | [AP]WO2008019915 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [AP] 1-11 * page 7, line 25 - page 20, line 11; figures 1-7 * |