EP2165158 - MEASUREMENT METHOD, SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Austriamicrosystems AG Schloss Premstätten 8141 Unterpremstätten / AT | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANGL, Hubert Zanklstr. 11/6 A-8051 Graz / AT | 02 /
BRETTERKLIEBER, Thomas Bachweg 10 A-8501 Lieboch / AT | 03 /
STEINER, Gerald Neuholdaugasse 104 A-8010 Graz / AT | 04 /
BRANDNER, Markus Grevenberggasse 48 A-8052 Graz / AT | [2010/17] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
ZANGL, Hubert Zanklstr. 11/6 A-8051 Graz / AT | ||
02 /
BRETTERKLIEBER, Thomas Bachweg 10 A-8501 Lieboch / AT | |||
03 /
STEINER, Gerald Grenadiergasse 36 A-8020 Graz / AT | |||
04 /
BRANDNER, Markus Grevenberggasse 48 A-8052 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 D-80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08761158.8 | 18.06.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008EP57704 | Priority number, date | DE20071031511 | 06.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007031511 | DE20071036984 | 06.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007036984 | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009007210 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165158 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165158 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14, G06F3/038 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01R33/077 (EP,US);
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/046 (EP,US);
G01D2205/95 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | MESSVERFAHREN, SENSORANORDNUNG UND MESSSYSTEM | [2010/12] | English: | MEASUREMENT METHOD, SENSOR ARRANGEMENT AND MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2010/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE, ARRANGEMENT DE DÉTECTION ET SYSTÈME DE MESURE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HR | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IE | 02.03.2011 | IT | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | MT | 02.03.2011 | NL | 02.03.2011 | PL | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | TR | 02.03.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | NO | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | LU | 18.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
TR | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
IT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
PL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
NL | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
HR | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 02.03.2011 | |
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
NO | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0621493 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,2,9,15,18 * pages 2-5; figures 1-5,9; claims 1,2 * [Y] 1-19; | [Y]US5959863 (HOYT JOSHUA K [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * columns 2-3,5-8; figures 1,6; claims 3,6-8 *; | [Y]WO0023824 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [Y] 1-19 * pages 1,5-6; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US2002077752 (BURRESON BERNARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0006] - [0014] - [0044] - [0056] - [0067] - [0079] *; | [PX]WO2008031725 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT], et al) [PX] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE102006042725 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]) [PX] 1,15* paragraphs [0060] - [0071]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0621493 | US5959863 | WO0023824 | US2002077752 |