EP2301084 - METHOD FOR LARGE-SCALE MANUFACTURING OF PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS FOR A CONVERTER PANEL AND PHOTOVOLTAIC CONVERTER PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEL Solar AG Hauptstrasse 1a 9477 Trübbach / CH | [2013/34] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Oerlikon Solar AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 1A 9477 Trübbach / CH | ||
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach Hauptstrasse 9477 Trübbach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPORI, Daniel Strada di Gandria 27 CH-6976 Castagnola / CH | 02 /
ROSCHEK, Tobias Schützenweg 13 CH-9470 Buchs / CH | 03 /
KROLL, Ulrich Le Fornel 7 CH-2035 Corcelles / CH | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2011/13] | Application number, filing date | 08761169.5 | 18.06.2008 | [2011/13] | WO2008EP57716 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009152854 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301084 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/072, H01L31/075 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
H01L31/076 (EP,US);
H01L31/075 (EP,US);
H01L31/1816 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FOTOVOLTAIKZELLEN IN GROSSEM MASSSTAB FÜR EIN WANDLERPANEL UND FOTOVOLTAIK-WANDLERPANEL | [2011/13] | English: | METHOD FOR LARGE-SCALE MANUFACTURING OF PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS FOR A CONVERTER PANEL AND PHOTOVOLTAIC CONVERTER PANEL | [2011/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION À GRANDE ÉCHELLE DE CELLULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES POUR PANNEAU CONVERTISSEUR, ET PANNEAU CONVERTISSEUR PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 25.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004149988 (SHIOZAKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-14,21,22 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0058] - [0062]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005034665 (KONDO TAKAHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-14,21,22 * paragraphs [0096] , [0108] - [0110]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2005028860 (SANO MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-22 * paragraphs [0050] , [0071] , [0090] , [0115] , [0119] - [0122] - [0124] , [0130]; figures 1,2; example 1 *; | [X]US5066340 (IWAMOTO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-14,21,22 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0871979 | US6309906 |