EP2163039 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA COMMUNICATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADTRAN GmbH Erika-Mann-Str. 25 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states ADTRAN GmbH Erika-Mann-Str. 25 80636 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks OY Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAUSBERGER, Walter Getreidegasse 14 A-3424 Wolfpassing / AT | 02 /
KOZEK, Werner Eipeldauerstr. 38/27/8 A-1220 Wien / AT | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Brachmann, Roland W., et al Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF T&I IPR / Patent Administration 80240 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08761232.1 | 19.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008EP57805 | Priority number, date | EP20070012855 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: EP 07012855 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009003849 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163039 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/2898 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DATENKOMMUNIKATION UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT EINER SOLCHEN EINRICHTUNG | [2010/11] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DATA COMMUNICATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH DEVICE | [2010/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005122477 (TELES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 9 ** page 13, line 25 - line 30 *; | [X]US2006193295 (WHITE PATRICK E [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1a * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] * | Examination | US5630204 | US2004168199 | US7142503 |