EP2159223 - 6 -ACYLOXY- 7-METH0XY- 2, 2 -DIMETHYLCHROMANE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS PIGMENTATION-REGULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lipotec, S.A. Polígono Industrial Camí Ral. C/Isaac Peral °17 08850 Gavà-Barcelona / ES | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Lipotec, S.A. Polígono Industrial Camí Ral. C/Isaac Peraln °17 08850 Gavá-Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSEGUER PEYPOCH, Ángel C/Industria 103, 4-1 E-08025 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
FERRER MONTIEL, Antonio Avd. Ansaldo, 4 Bloque Y, 2·N, Esc. 3 03540 Alicante / ES | 03 /
CEBRIAN PUCHE, Juan Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes 911 2· 1a E-08018 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
ALMIÑANA DOMENECH, Nuria C/Garona n·14 E-08030 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
CARREÑO SERRAÏMA, Cristina C/Calabria, n· 27 2-3 E-08015 Barcelona / ES | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
MESSEGUER PEYPOCH, Ángel C/Industria 103, 4-1 E-08025 Barcelona / ES | ||
02 /
FERRER MONTIEL, Antonio Avd. Ansaldo, 4 Bloque Y, 2·N, Esc. 3 03540 Alicante / ES | |||
03 /
CEBRIAN PUCHE, Juan Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes 911 2· 1a E-08018 Barcelona / ES | |||
04 /
ALMIÑANA DOMENECH, Nuria C/Garona n·14 E-08030 Barcelona / ES | |||
05 /
CARREÑO SERRAÏMA, Cristina C/Calabria, n· 27 2-3 E-08015 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. C/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2010/09] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Goya 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08761477.2 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008ES00230 | Priority number, date | ES20070001663 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: ES 200701663 | US20080037085P | 17.03.2008 Original published format: US 37085 P | [2013/52] |
Former [2010/09] | ES20070001663 | 15.06.2007 | |
US20080037085 | 17.03.2008 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008152159 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2159223 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159223 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/72, C07D405/12, C07D407/12, C07D409/12, C07D495/04, A61K8/49, A61K31/353, A61Q3/00, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/04 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
C07D311/72 (EP,ES,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/04 (EP,US);
A61Q3/00 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | C07D311/72, C07D405/12, C07D407/12, C07D409/12, C07D495/04, A61K8/49, A61K31/353 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 6 -ACYLOXY- 7-METH0XY- 2, 2 DIMETHYLCHROMANVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS PIGMENTATIONSREGLER | [2010/09] | English: | 6 -ACYLOXY- 7-METH0XY- 2, 2 -DIMETHYLCHROMANE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS PIGMENTATION-REGULATORS | [2010/09] | French: | COMPOSÉS 6-ACYLOXY-7-MÉTHOXY-2,2 -DIMÉTHYLCHROMANE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME RÉGULATEURS DE LA PIGMENTATION | [2013/52] |
Former [2010/09] | COMPOSÉS 6-ACYLOXY-7-MÉTHOXY-2,2 -DIMÉTHYLCHROMANE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME RÉGULATEURS DE LA PIGMENTATION& xA; | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2009 | Translation filed | 28.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2008 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | IE | 11.04.2014 | LU | 11.04.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.04.2008 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.04.2008 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
LU | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.04.2008 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 11.04.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0182888 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [A]EP1260509 (DERMA DEV S A R L [FR]); |