EP2155453 - KNIFE SYSTEM FOR A DISC CHIPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Technologies, Inc. Keilasatama 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONKKA, Arvo Mäntykatu 20 FI-28430 Pori / FI | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Aalto, Juha-Matti, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Aalto, Juha-Matti, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A FI-00120 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/08] | Haimelin, Jukka Ilmari, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08761665.2 | 13.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008FI50269 | Priority number, date | FI20070000467 | 13.06.2007 Original published format: FI 20070467 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152191 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155453 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B27L11/00, B27G13/08, B23B29/12 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B27G13/04 (EP,US);
B27L11/02 (FI);
B27G13/10 (EP,US);
B27L11/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | MESSERSYSTEM FÜR EINEN SCHEIBENHÄCKSLER | [2010/08] | English: | KNIFE SYSTEM FOR A DISC CHIPPER | [2010/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COUTEAU POUR UN DÉCHIQUETEUR À DISQUE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5857508 (JONKKA ARVO [FI]); | [A]WO9015702 (IGGESUND TOOLS AB [SE]); | [A]US2005211339 (JONKKA ARVO [FI]) |