EP2155237 - GLYCOSYLASPARAGINASE FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/08] | METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF CANCERS OR INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | ||
[2015/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oy Reagena Ltd Takojantie 18 70900 Toivala / FI | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONONEN, Ilkka Kupittaankatu 40 FI-20700 Turku / FI | 02 /
KELO, Eira Rissalantie 33 a 3 FI-70910 Vuorela / FI | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Öhman, Ann-Marie Kaivokatu 15 B 23 20520 Turku / FI | ||
Former [2010/08] | Öhman, Ann-Marie Kaivokatu 15 B 23 20520 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 08761679.3 | 20.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008FI50283 | Priority number, date | FI20070000455 | 08.06.2007 Original published format: FI 20070455 | US20070942721P | 08.06.2007 Original published format: US 942721 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008148932 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2155237 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155237 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/50, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, C12N9/82 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
A61K38/50 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C12N9/82 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/08] | A61K38/50, A61P35/00, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/06] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLYKOSYLASPARAGINASE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2015/41] | English: | GLYCOSYLASPARAGINASE FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2015/41] | French: | GLYCOSYLASPARAGINASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS | [2015/41] |
Former [2010/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS- ODER ENTZÜNDUNGSERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2010/08] | METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF CANCERS OR INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | ||
Former [2010/08] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS OU DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2008 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | IT | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | LU | 20.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.05.2008 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.05.2008 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LU | 20.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4617271 (NAMBU MASAO [JP]) [A] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * claims; column 1, line 8 - line 15 * * claims; column 1, line 8 - line 15 * * claims; column 1, line 8 - line 15 *; | [A]EP0811687 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [A] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 25, line 1 - line 13; table 8 * * claims * * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 25, line 1 - line 13; table 8 * * claims * * page 2, line 3 - line 4 * * page 25, line 1 - line 13; table 8 * * claims *; | [A]US6251388 (DURDEN DONALD L [US]) [A] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * claims; column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 11 * * claims; column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 11 * * claims; column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 11 *; | [AD]WO03038113 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * claims; page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 3 * * claims; page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 3 * * claims; page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 3 *; | [AD]US2004197299 (DELATTRE CAROLINE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * claims; paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * * claims; paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * * claims; paragraphs [0018] - [0021] *; | [A] - YLIKANGAS PAIVI ET AL, "Serious neutropenia in ALL patients treated with L-asparaginase may be avoided by therapeutic monitoring of the enzyme activity in the circulation", THERAPEUTIC DRUG MONITORING, (200208), vol. 24, no. 4, ISSN 0163-4356, pages 502 - 506, XP009109534 [A] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007691-200208000-00007 | [A] - REIFF A ET AL, "Treatment of collagen induced arthritis in DBA/1 mice with L-asparaginase.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RHEUMATOLOGY 2001 NOV-DEC, (200111), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0392-856X, pages 639 - 646, XP009109566 [A] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * abstract * * page 640, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * * abstract * * page 640, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * * abstract * * page 640, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 2 * | [DA] - KAARTINEN V ET AL, "SUBSTRATE SPECIFICITY AND REACTION MECHANISM OF HUMAN GLYCOASPARAGINASE THE N-GLYCOSIDIC LINKAGE OF VARIOUS GLYCOASPARAGINES IS CLEAVED THROUGH A REACTION MECHANISM SIMILAR TO L ASPARAGINASE", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 267, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6855 - 6858, XP002506519 [DA] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * | Examination | - Dominika Borek ET AL, "Expression, purification and catalytic activity of Lupinus luteus asparagine [beta]-amidohydrolase and its Escherichia coli homolog", European Journal of Biochemistry, GB, (20040714), vol. 271, no. 15, doi:10.1111/j.1432-1033.2004.04254.x, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 3215 - 3226, XP055188258 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.2004.04254.x |